This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2021 at 12:59:15 (UTC).

Rorabaugh v. Service Employees International Union, Local 668 et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 Rorabaugh filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Service Employees International Union, Local 668. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew W. Brann and Yvette Kane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02463

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Matthew W. Brann

Yvette Kane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melanie Rorabaugh

Defendants

Service Employees International Union, Local 668

Michael Newsome

Brian T. Lyman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin Thomas Miller

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North 3Rd Street, 2Nd Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Danielle RA Susanj

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Floor 2

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Nathan J. McGrath

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Floor 2

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren M. Hoye

Attorney at Willig, Williams & Davidson

1845 Walnut Street, 24Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

P. Casey Pitts

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Scott A Kronland

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Jeffrey B. Demain

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Nancy A. Walker

Attorney at Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General

1600 Arch Street, Ste. 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Jonathan M. Blake

Attorney at Office of Attorney General - Civil Litigation Division

15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jeffrey B. Demain. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/2/21. (dmn) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#20

(#20) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jeffrey B. Demain on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Local 668 Attorney Jeffrey Demain is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5455166.. (Demain, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy A. Walker on behalf of Brian T. Lyman, Michael Newsome (Walker, Nancy) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Blake on behalf of Brian T. Lyman, Michael Newsome (Blake, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for defendant Service Employees International Union, Local 668 to respond to plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to 3/9/2021. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/26/2021. (jr) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#15

(#16) Supplement by Service Employees International Union, Local 668. to #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaints - Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaints. (Pitts, P. Casey) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#14

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#7

(#7) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott A Kronland on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Local 668 Attorney Scott Kronland is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5431495.. (Kronland, Scott) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#5

(#5) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by P. Casey Pitts on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Local 668 Attorney P. Casey Pitts is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5430667., filed by on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Local 668.(Pitts, P. Casey) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Hoye on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Local 668 (Hoye, Lauren) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/8/2021. (jr) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Brian T. Lyman, Michael Newsome, Service Employees International Union, Local 668 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Brian T. Lyman, Michael Newsome, Service Employees International Union, Local 668 ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5409027), filed by Melanie Rorabaugh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Portions of Memo of Understanding between PA and Local 668, effective 7/1/2019 to 6/30/2023 and Response letter from Local 668 to pltf, dated 6/18/2020)(jw) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jeffrey B. Demain. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/2/21. (dmn) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketVERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Yvette Kane for all further proceedings. Honorable Matthew W. Brann no longer assigned to case.(dmn) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified California bar record of Attorney Jeffrey Demain. (lg) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jeffrey B. Demain on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Local 668 Attorney Jeffrey Demain is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5455166.. (Demain, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy A. Walker on behalf of Brian T. Lyman, Michael Newsome (Walker, Nancy) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Blake on behalf of Brian T. Lyman, Michael Newsome (Blake, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: At the request of counsel Doc. 18 deleted and to be refiled. (pjr) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for defendant Service Employees International Union, Local 668 to respond to plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to 3/9/2021. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/26/2021. (jr) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Supplement by Service Employees International Union, Local 668. to #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaints - Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaints. (Pitts, P. Casey) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Pitts is instructed to file a separate form of Order for the Motion for Extension of Time with the complete caption, case number, title, text and signature line. (The last page of the Motion is an incomplete captioned form of Order.) (lg) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Scott Kronland. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/15/2021. (lg) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified California bar record of Attorney Scott Kronland. (lg) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott A Kronland on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Local 668 Attorney Scott Kronland is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5431495.. (Kronland, Scott) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney P. Casey Pitts. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/14/2021. (lg) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified CA bar record of Attorney P. Casey Pitts. (lg) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by P. Casey Pitts on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Local 668 Attorney P. Casey Pitts is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5430667., filed by on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Local 668.(Pitts, P. Casey) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Hoye on behalf of Service Employees International Union, Local 668 (Hoye, Lauren) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/8/2021. (jr) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Brian T. Lyman, Michael Newsome, Service Employees International Union, Local 668 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Brian T. Lyman, Michael Newsome, Service Employees International Union, Local 668 ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5409027), filed by Melanie Rorabaugh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Portions of Memo of Understanding between PA and Local 668, effective 7/1/2019 to 6/30/2023 and Response letter from Local 668 to pltf, dated 6/18/2020)(jw) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Danielle Susanj

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan J. McGrath