This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/16/2021 at 09:02:04 (UTC).

Johnson v. Cellco Partnership, et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Johnson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Cellco Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00187

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Angela Roper

Renee Johnson

Defendants

Verizon Communications Inc.

Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

Verizon Pennsylvania LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James B. Zouras

Attorney at Stephan Zouras, LLP

100 North Riverside Plaza, Suite 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

Ryan F Stephan

Attorney at Stephan, Zouras, LLP

100 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

DAVID J. COHEN

Attorney at STEPHAN ZOURAS LLP

604 Spruce Street

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Defendant Attorneys

NATALIA DELAUNE

Attorney at JONES DAY

2727 North Harwood St, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

BRIAN JORGENSEN

Attorney at JONES DAY

2727 N. Harwood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

JAMES S. URBAN

Attorney at JONES DAY

500 Grant Street, Suite 3100

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Stanley Weiner

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 North Harwood

Dallas, TX 75201

Elizabeth Bethea McRee

Attorney at Jones Day

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601-1692

Victoria Lauren Bliss

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 N. Harwood Street

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

95 #16

Exhibit

95 #7

Exhibit

95 #6

Exhibit

95 #5

Exhibit

95 #4

Exhibit

95 #3

Exhibit

95 #2

Exhibit

#95

#94

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Exhibit A2 Johnson Consent

1 #1

Exhibit A1 Roper Consent

#1

271 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) MEMORANDUM by Renee Johnson in support of motion to certify class #94 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for FLSA Conditional Certification and Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Zouras, James) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) MOTION by Plaintiff Renee Johnson to certify class Plaintiff's Motion for FLSA Conditional Certification and Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zouras, James) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 3/17/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Because Plaintiff's I-Pass records may bear on her suitability as a representative plaintiff, and because the burden of producing the requested materials is low, Defendant may take limited discovery regarding those records. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 3/17/2021 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion to appear pro hac vice #2 and #4 are denied as moot. Motions to appear pro hac vice #84 , #87 , #88 , #89 and #90 are granted. The status hearing set for 2/17/2021 at 9:15 a.m. #18 is re-set for 9:00 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cellco Partnership (Urban, James) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17917295. (Jorgensen, Brian) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17914022. (Bliss, Victoria) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17914017. (Urban, James) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17914009. (Delaune, Natalia) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Renee Johnson by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant Verizon Communications Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(URBAN, JAMES) Modified on 2/21/2019 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/15/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. AND CELLCO PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT (SEE DOCKET NO. 1) IS EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 18, 2019. THIS IS THE FIRST STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. NO PRIOR EXTENSION HAS BEEN GRANTED. THE EXTENSION IS FOR A PERIOD NOT EXCEEDING THIRTY (30) DAYS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/15/19. 1/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/15/2021.] (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to Class and Collective Action Complaint by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (URBAN, JAMES) Modified on 1/15/2019 (lvj, ).(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/15/2021.] (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF RYAN F. STEPHAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/14/19. 1/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/15/2021.] (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan F. Stephan by RENEE JOHNSON, ANGELA ROPER. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13279270.). (COHEN, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/15/2021.] (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JAMES B. ZOURAS, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/8/19. 1/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/15/2021.] (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James B. Zouras by RENEE JOHNSON, ANGELA ROPER. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13268666.). (COHEN, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/15/2021.] (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by RENEE JOHNSON, ANGELA ROPER. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/15/2021.] (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued as to CELLCO PARTNERSHIP, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/7/2018. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/15/2021.] (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CELLCO PARTNERSHIP, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 188968.), filed by ANGELA ROPER, RENEE JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 Roper Consent, #2 Exhibit A2 Johnson Consent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track Form)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/15/2021.] (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Communications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID J. COHEN