This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/08/2019 at 07:43:00 (UTC).

Roper et al v. James-Wray et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Roper filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against James-Wray. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01651

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deidra M Roper

Spinderella Entertainment LLC

Spinderella

Defendants

James Maynes

Cheryl James-Wray

Sandra Denton

S&C Productions Inc

Cheryl James

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sydne K. Collier

Attorney at Thompson & Knight LLP

1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Paul K Stafford

Attorney at Thompson & Knight LLP

1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Craig Carpenter

Attorney at Thompson & Knight LLP

1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

David Grant Crooks

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

5420 Lbj Frwy, Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75240

C Dunham Biles

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

5420 Lbj Freeway, Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75240

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Veronica S Lewis

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

2100 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75201-6912

 

Court Documents

#35

34 #1

Proposed Order

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#28

#27

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaintand, Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Extend Defendants' Responsive Pleading and Briefing Deadlines() filed by Sandra Denton, Cheryl James-Wray, James Maynes, S&C Productions Inc (Biles, C) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Deidra M Roper, Spinderella Entertainment LLC re: #30 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Collier, Sydne) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Spinderella Entertainment LLC, Deidra M Roper. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Collier, Sydne) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Grant Crooks on behalf of Sandra Denton, Cheryl James-Wray, James Maynes, S&C Productions Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Crooks, David) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Appendix in Support filed by Sandra Denton, Cheryl James-Wray, James Maynes, S&C Productions Inc re #30 MOTION to Dismiss (Biles, C) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sandra Denton, Cheryl James-Wray, James Maynes, S&C Productions Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Biles, C) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docket(#29) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2019 Re: Motion for TRO filed by Spinderella Entertainment LLC, Deidra M Roper. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Sydne Collier, Craig Carpenter and Paul Stafford; Defense - David Grant Crooks and Dunham Biles. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :54. (chmb) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER denying Motion for TRO. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/2/2019) (rekc) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Veronica S Lewis as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation within 90 days. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/2/2019) (rekc) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Declaration of James Maynes in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Request for TRO filed by Sandra Denton, Cheryl James-Wray, James Maynes, S&C Productions Inc re: MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Biles, C) Modified text on 8/5/2019 (axm). (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Sandra Denton, Cheryl James-Wray, James Maynes, S&C Productions Inc. (zkc) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (zkc) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order (contained in #1 Complaint) filed by Deidra M Roper, Spinderella Entertainment LLC. (zkc) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deidra M Roper, Spinderella Entertainment LLC. (Stafford, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Sandra Denton filed by Deidra M Roper, Spinderella Entertainment LLC. (Stafford, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons to S & C Productions, Inc. filed by Deidra M Roper, Spinderella Entertainment LLC. (Stafford, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons to James Maynes filed by Deidra M Roper, Spinderella Entertainment LLC. (Stafford, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Cheryl James-Wray filed by Deidra M Roper, Spinderella Entertainment LLC. (Stafford, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Spinderella Entertainment LLC, Deidra M Roper. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10107467) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Stafford, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Veronica Smith Lewis