This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 07:33:13 (UTC).

Rooted, LLC v. Discovery, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Rooted, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Discovery, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael R. Barrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00328

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael R. Barrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rooted, LLC

Defendants

Monique Lenai Enterprises, LLC doing business as Rooted

Discovery, Inc.

Monique Idlett-Mosley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachael Leigh Rodman

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

65 East State Street, Suite 1100

Columbus, OH 43215

Aaron Mark Herzig

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Adam R. Bennett

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

65 East State Street, Suite 1100

Columbus, OH 43215

Ava M. Abner

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

600 Vine St., Suite 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

John Francis Bennett

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

600 Vine Street, Suite 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202-2409

Philip Roland Bautista

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

200 Public Square, Suite 3500

Cleveland, OH 44114

Rachel Smoot

65 East State Street, Suite 1000

Columbus, OH 43215

Jonathan G. Polak

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

One Indiana Square, Suite 3500

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Defendant Attorneys

Mark E Avsec

Attorney at Benesch Freidlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP

200 Public Square, Suite 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114-2378

Gregory Frederick Ahrens

Attorney at Wood, Herron & Evans - 1

441 Vine Street, Suite 2700

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Alison B. Schary

1301 K Street Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#18

#16

#15

#14

#13

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held re #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Aaron Herzig, Philip Bautista, Rachel Smoot and Jonathan Polak appeared for plaintiff; Gregory Ahrens and Alison Schary appeared for defendant Discovery, Inc.; Mark Avsec and Michael Weinstein appeared for defendants Monique Lenai Enterprises, LLC and Monique Idlett-Mosley; oral argument on #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 8/18/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 109 before the Honorable Michael R. Barrett; the parties shall agree on argument time limits and advise the Court for scheduling purposes. (ba) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan G. Polak as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/29/2021. (eh) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Rooted, LLC. (Bautista, Philip) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Plaintiff Rooted, LLC of Withdrawal of Counsel (Rodman, Rachael) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8377805) of Jonathan G. Polak by Plaintiff Rooted, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Jonathan Polak) (Bautista, Philip) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Hearing re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Briefing Schedule by Plaintiff Rooted, LLC. (Bautista, Philip) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Brief re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Rooted, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Megan E. Tysoe, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A to D to Declaration of Megan E. Tysoe, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Werner, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 12 to Declaration of Elizabeth Werner, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Elizabeth Werner, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Elizabeth Werner, #7 Exhibit Exhibits 15 to 26 to Declaration of Elizabeth Werner) (Bautista, Philip) Modified to clarify docket text on 6/25/2021 (jlw). (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Rooted, LLC. (Bautista, Philip) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Roland Bautista for Plaintiff Rooted, LLC (Bautista, Philip) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Mark Herzig for Plaintiff Rooted, LLC (Herzig, Aaron) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Discovery, Inc.. (Ahrens, Gregory) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 7/21/2021. by Defendants Discovery, Inc., Monique Idlett-Mosley, Monique Lenai Enterprises, LLC. (Avsec, Mark) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Discovery, Inc., Monique Idlett-Mosley, Monique Lenai Enterprises, LLC. (bjc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Monique Idlett-Mosley (Rodman, Rachael) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Monique Lenai Enterprises, LLC (Rodman, Rachael) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Discovery, Inc. (Rodman, Rachael) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Rooted, LLC. (Rodman, Rachael) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Plaintiff Rooted, LLC re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Rodman, Rachael) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Discovery, Inc., Monique Idlett-Mosley, Monique Lenai Enterprises, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8311818), filed by Rooted, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rooted Trademark Registrations, #2 Exhibit B - MLE Corporate Documents, #3 Exhibit C - MLE Trademark Application, #4 Exhibit D - Cease and Desist Letter) (Rodman, Rachael) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVERY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Smoot

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachael Leigh Rodman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Francis Bennett