This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2020 at 08:42:16 (UTC).

Root v. Matherne et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Root filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Matherne. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis T. Babcock. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03025

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis T. Babcock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Root

Defendants

Joshua Matherne

Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC.

Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert F. James

Attorney at Darrell S. Elliott, P.C.

1600 Pennsylvania Street

Denver, CO 80203-1303

Defendant Attorneys

Jamey William Jamison

Attorney at Harris Karstaedt Jamison & Powers PC-Englewood

10333 East Dry Creek Road, Suite 300

Englewood, CO 80112

Dino Gabriel Moncecchi

Attorney at Harris Karstaedt Jamison & Powers PC-Englewood

10333 East Dry Creek Road, Suite 300

Englewood, CO 80112

Andrew James Carafelli

Attorney at Harris Karstaedt Jamison & Powers PC-Englewood

10333 East Dry Creek Road, Suite 300

Englewood, CO 80112

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) MIUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time for Service of Process of Defendant Joshua Matherne (Doc #19 - filed November 20, 2020) is GRANTED up to and including January 7, 2021, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/23/2020.(angar, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#21

(#21) SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 11/23/2020 (angar, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#20

(#20) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Joshua Matherne by Plaintiff Ronald Root. (James, Robert) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

19 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Process on Defendant Joshua Matherne (Second motion) by Plaintiff Ronald Root. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(James, Robert) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#18

(#18) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Ronald Root as to Joshua Matherne. (James, Robert) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#17

(#17) MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Special Appointment Regarding Service of Process of Defendant Joshua Matherne, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/12/2020. (ebuch) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

16 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#16

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Order to Specially Appoint for Service of Process of Defendant, Joshua Matherne by Plaintiff Ronald Root. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(James, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G - State Court Docket

1 #6

Exhibit F - State Court Orders

1 #5

Exhibit E - Answer of Swift

1 #4

Exhibit D - Return of Service on Swift

1 #3

Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet State Court

1 #2

Exhibit B - Summons to Swift

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC., Joshua Matherne from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020CV31563. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7528124), filed by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC., Joshua Matherne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons to Swift, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet State Court, #4 Exhibit D - Return of Service on Swift, #5 Exhibit E - Answer of Swift, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Orders, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Docket, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jamison, Jamey) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MIUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time for Service of Process of Defendant Joshua Matherne (Doc #19 - filed November 20, 2020) is GRANTED up to and including January 7, 2021, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/23/2020.(angar, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 11/23/2020 (angar, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Joshua Matherne by Plaintiff Ronald Root. (James, Robert) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Process on Defendant Joshua Matherne (Second motion) by Plaintiff Ronald Root. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(James, Robert) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Ronald Root as to Joshua Matherne. (James, Robert) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Special Appointment Regarding Service of Process of Defendant Joshua Matherne, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/12/2020. (ebuch) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Order to Specially Appoint for Service of Process of Defendant, Joshua Matherne by Plaintiff Ronald Root. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(James, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 11/3/2020 (angar, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Joshua Matherne by Plaintiff Ronald Root. (James, Robert) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time for Service of Process of Defendant Joshua Matherne (Doc #12 - filed October 9, 2020) is GRANTED up to and including November 23, 2020, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/13/2020.(angar, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew James Carafelli on behalf of Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLCAttorney Andrew James Carafelli added to party Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC(pty:dft) (Carafelli, Andrew) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dino Gabriel Moncecchi on behalf of Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLCAttorney Dino Gabriel Moncecchi added to party Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC(pty:dft) (Moncecchi, Dino) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND OF THE DEFENDANT SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF THE ARIZONA, LLC to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC.(alave, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service upon Joshua Matherne and Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC on 09/09/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, filed by Ronald Root, Joshua Matherne.(alave, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Swift Transportation CO. of Arizona, LLC, A Limited Liability Company Registered in the State of Delaware and Doing Business in the State of Colorado for Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC.. (Jamison, Jamey) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC., Joshua Matherne from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020CV31563. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7528124), filed by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC., Joshua Matherne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons to Swift, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet State Court, #4 Exhibit D - Return of Service on Swift, #5 Exhibit E - Answer of Swift, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Orders, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Docket, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jamison, Jamey) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC is a litigant