This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 08:16:08 (UTC).

Rooney v. Touchette et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Rooney filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Touchette. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judges overseeing this case are John M. Conroy and William K. Sessions III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00227

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John M. Conroy

Presiding Judge

William K. Sessions III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Rooney

Defendants

P. Berryhill

Deborah Johnson

Michael Touchette

Martin Frink

Core Civil Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelly Green, Esq.

Attorney at Prisoners' Rights Office

6 Baldwin Street

Montpelier, VT 05633

Defendant Attorneys

Geoffrey J. Vitt, Esq.

Attorney at Vitt & Associates

8 Beaver Meadow Road, P.O. Box 1229

Norwich, VT 05055-1229

Phillipa G. Lilienthal, Esq.

Attorney at Vitt & Associates

8 Beaver Meadow Road, P.O. Box 1229

Norwich, VT 05055-1229

 

Court Documents

#1

(#15) NOTICE by Michael Touchette of Filing #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 12/2/2019 in state court)(law) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Washington Unit requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (law) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#3

(#17) STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brian Rooney.(Green, Kelly) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Clerk on 9/16/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (originally filed 9/16/2019 in state court) (law) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

7 #5

Exhibit E

7 #6

Exhibit F

7 #7

Exhibit G

7 #4

Exhibit D

#24

(#24) LETTER remanding case to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Washington Unit. (law) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#22

(#22) STIPULATED MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brian Rooney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Green, Kelly) Event/Text clarified on 1/22/2020 (jlh). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

22 #1

Certificate of Service

#21

(#21) ORDER: re #16 CONSENTED-TO MOTION to Amend #7 Complaint: The absence of any allegations against Defendants Frink, Johnson, Berryhill, or Core Civic Corporation leads the Court to conclude that Defendants Frink, Johnson, Berryhill, and Core Civic Corporation are no longer Defendants in this action. If this assumption is incorrect, Plaintiff may seek leave under Rule 15 to file a Second Amended Complaint within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/14/2020. (eh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

16 #1

Proposed Amended Petition

#16

(#16) CONSENTED-TO MOTION to Amend #7 Complaint filed by Brian Rooney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Petition)(Green, Kelly) Modified on 12/26/2019 (law). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#17

(#17) STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brian Rooney.(Green, Kelly) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

20 #1

Exhibit 1

#20

(#20) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Touchette filed by Brian Rooney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (eh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) LETTER remanding case to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Washington Unit. (law) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER granting #22 Stipulated Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/23/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATED MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brian Rooney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Green, Kelly) Event/Text clarified on 1/22/2020 (jlh). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER: re #16 CONSENTED-TO MOTION to Amend #7 Complaint: The absence of any allegations against Defendants Frink, Johnson, Berryhill, or Core Civic Corporation leads the Court to conclude that Defendants Frink, Johnson, Berryhill, and Core Civic Corporation are no longer Defendants in this action. If this assumption is incorrect, Plaintiff may seek leave under Rule 15 to file a Second Amended Complaint within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/14/2020. (eh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #17 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/10/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Touchette filed by Brian Rooney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (eh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #16 Consented-To Motion to Amend #7 Complaint. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/7/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brian Rooney.(Green, Kelly) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CONSENTED-TO MOTION to Amend #7 Complaint filed by Brian Rooney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Petition)(Green, Kelly) Modified on 12/26/2019 (law). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE by Michael Touchette of Filing #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 12/2/2019 in state court)(law) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Discovery Request by Brian Rooney. (originally filed 10/9/2019 in state court)(law) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly Green, Esq on behalf of Brian Rooney. (originally filed 10/7/2019 in state court)(law) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER sent to Prisoner Rights Office. (originally filed 9/17/2019 in state court) (law) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) COMPLAINT against P. Berryhill, Core Civil Corporation, Martin Frink, Deborah Johnson, Michael Touchette filed by Brian Rooney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (originally filed 9/16/2019 in state court)(law) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Clerk on 9/16/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (originally filed 9/16/2019 in state court) (law) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Brian Rooney. (originally filed 9/16/2019 in state court)(law) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Touchette.(Vitt, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Washington Unit requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (law) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Touchette from Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Washington Unit, case number 502-9-19 Wncv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(law) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.