This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2020 at 09:12:25 (UTC).

Rooftop Restoration & Exteriors, Inc. v. Nautilus Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Rooftop Restoration Exteriors, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nautilus Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03158

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rooftop Restoration & Exteriors, Inc

Defendant

Nautilus Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Lenn Weeks

Attorney at Weeks & Luchetta LLP

102 South Tejon, Suite 910

Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin F. Amatuzio

Attorney at Montgomery Amatuzio Chase Bell Jones LLP-Denver

4100 E. Mississippi Avenue, Mountain Towers, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80246-3048

Christy Noelle Redmond

Attorney at Montgomery Amatuzio Chase Bell Jones LLP-Denver

4100 E. Mississippi Avenue, Mountain Towers, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80246-3048

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Stay of Action by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/30/2020.(jgonz, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Stay of Action by Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Nautilus Insurance Company.(Amatuzio, Kevin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Lenn Weeks on behalf of Rooftop Restoration & Exteriors, IncAttorney Jeffrey Lenn Weeks added to party Rooftop Restoration & Exteriors, Inc(pty:pla) (Weeks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/23/2020. Consent Form due by 12/21/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/21/2020 (evaug) Modified on 10/27/2020 to correct the date filed (ebuch). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christy Noelle Redmond on behalf of Nautilus Insurance CompanyAttorney Christy Noelle Redmond added to party Nautilus Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Nautilus Insurance Company, filed by Rooftop Restoration & Exteriors, Inc.(alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

1 #7

Proposed Document Notice of Filing State Court Docket

1 #6

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Proposed Document Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Stay of Action by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/30/2020.(jgonz, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION to Stay of Action by Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Nautilus Insurance Company.(Amatuzio, Kevin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Lenn Weeks on behalf of Rooftop Restoration & Exteriors, IncAttorney Jeffrey Lenn Weeks added to party Rooftop Restoration & Exteriors, Inc(pty:pla) (Weeks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/23/2020. Consent Form due by 12/21/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/21/2020 (evaug) Modified on 10/27/2020 to correct the date filed (ebuch). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christy Noelle Redmond on behalf of Nautilus Insurance CompanyAttorney Christy Noelle Redmond added to party Nautilus Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Nautilus Insurance Company, filed by Rooftop Restoration & Exteriors, Inc.(alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nautilus Insurance Company from El Paso District Court, Case Number 20cv31451. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7553303), filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Document Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Document Notice of Filing State Court Docket, #8 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing State Court Docket)(Amatuzio, Kevin) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Lenn Weeks