This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2022 at 07:29:26 (UTC).

Roofing Solutions L L C v C M S Building Solutions L L C et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 Roofing Solutions L L C filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against C M S Building Solutions L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02156

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roofing Solutions L L C

Defendants

C M S Building Solutions L L C

Walga M T E L L C

X Y Z Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Teresa D Cop

Attorney at Kaster & Cop

P O Box 815

Zachary, LA 70775

Craig L Kaster

Attorney at Craig L Kaster & Assoc

P O Box 815

Zachary, LA 70791

Defendant Attorneys

Murphy J Foster, III

Attorney at Breazeale Sachse & Wilson (BR)

P O Box 3197

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Jacob E Roussel

Attorney at Breazeale Sachse & Wilson (BR)

P O Box 3197

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roofing Solutions, L.L.C.. (aty,Kaster, Craig) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to C M S Building Solutions L L C, Walga M T E L L C, X Y Z Insurance Co. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roofing Solutions L L C. C M S Building Solutions L L C waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/17/2022. (aty,Kaster, Craig) Modified to correct service and answer deadlines as an erroneous service date was entered at the time of e-filing on 8/18/2022 (Chavis, J). (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roofing Solutions L L C. Walga M T E L L C served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (aty,Kaster, Craig) Modified to indicate page 2 of summons filed as doc #6 on 9/13/2022 (Chavis, J). (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roofing Solutions L L C. (aty,Kaster, Craig) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walga M T E L L C (aty,Foster, Murphy) Modified docket text on 9/16/2022 (Whitener, M). (Entered: 09/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walga M T E L L C (aty,Foster, Murphy) Modified docket text on 9/16/2022 (Whitener, M). (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Walga M T E L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Murphy J Foster, III added to party Walga M T E L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Foster, Murphy) Modified docket text on 9/16/2022 (Whitener, M). (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roofing Solutions L L C. (aty,Kaster, Craig) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roofing Solutions L L C. Walga M T E L L C served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (aty,Kaster, Craig) Modified to indicate page 2 of summons filed as doc #6 on 9/13/2022 (Chavis, J). (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Corrective Action to Craig L Kaster on behalf of Roofing Solutions L L C regarding #4 Waiver of Service Executed. Action taken: docket text modified to reflect correct waiver sent date 7/19/2022 and answer due date 09/17/2022 as an incorrect service date was entered at the time of e-filing. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roofing Solutions L L C. C M S Building Solutions L L C waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/17/2022. (aty,Kaster, Craig) Modified to correct service and answer deadlines as an erroneous service date was entered at the time of e-filing on 8/18/2022 (Chavis, J). (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to C M S Building Solutions L L C, Walga M T E L L C, X Y Z Insurance Co. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roofing Solutions, L.L.C.. (aty,Kaster, Craig) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5180893) filed by Roofing Solutions, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified demand letter, #2 Request for Admissions of Fact, #3 Request for Admissions of Fact, #4 Verification, #5 Civil cover sheet, #6 Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service, #7 Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service)(Attorney Craig L Kaster added to party Roofing Solutions, L.L.C.(pty:pla))(aty,Kaster, Craig) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walga MTE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Ellis Roussel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Murphy J Foster, III