This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2020 at 09:15:19 (UTC).

Roof Club, LLC v. Depositors Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Roof Club, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Depositors Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael E. Hegarty and Christine M. Arguello. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03124

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roof Club, LLC doing business as Lumin Systems General

Roof Club, LLC doing business as Lumin Systems General Contractors

Defendant

Depositors Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer A. Milne

Attorney at Roth Milne

950 South Cherry Street, Suite 416

Denver, CO 80246

David Martin Roth

Attorney at Roth Milne

950 South Cherry Street, Suite 416

Denver, CO 80246

Defendant Attorneys

John M. Palmeri

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Katelyn Shea Werner

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Paul W. Jordan, Jr.

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

555 Seventeenth Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is Case returned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. Judge Lewis T. Babcock is no longer assigned to case. (angar, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#16

(#16) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 November 2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #15 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#15

(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Depositors Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul W. Jordan, Jr on behalf of Depositors Insurance CompanyAttorney Paul W. Jordan, Jr added to party Depositors Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Jordan, Paul) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#13

(#13) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 October 2020. At the request of the parties, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for December 15, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled for January 6, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #7 ) on or before December 17, 2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/30/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 October 2020. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #7 ) on or before December 2, 2020. It is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on December 15, 2020, at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/8/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allied Group Inc, Corporate Parent Allied Holding (Delaware), Inc. for Depositors Insurance Company. (Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Depositors Insurance Company.(Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer A. Milne on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jennifer A. Milne added to party Roof Club, LLC (pty:pla) (Milne, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Martin Roth on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David Martin Roth added to party Roof Club, LLC (pty:pla) (Roth, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Amended Complaint and Jury Demand upon Depositors Insurance Company on 09/28/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Depositors Insurance Company, filed by Roof Club, LLC.(alave, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katelyn Shea Werner on behalf of Depositors Insurance CompanyAttorney Katelyn Shea Werner added to party Depositors Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Depositors Insurance Company from Elbert County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30052. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7544933), filed by Depositors Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Palmeri, John) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket(#19) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/3/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is Case returned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. Judge Lewis T. Babcock is no longer assigned to case. (angar, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03124-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 November 2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #15 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Depositors Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul W. Jordan, Jr on behalf of Depositors Insurance CompanyAttorney Paul W. Jordan, Jr added to party Depositors Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Jordan, Paul) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 October 2020. At the request of the parties, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for December 15, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled for January 6, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #7 ) on or before December 17, 2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/30/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 October 2020. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #7 ) on or before December 2, 2020. It is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on December 15, 2020, at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/8/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allied Group Inc, Corporate Parent Allied Holding (Delaware), Inc. for Depositors Insurance Company. (Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Depositors Insurance Company.(Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer A. Milne on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jennifer A. Milne added to party Roof Club, LLC (pty:pla) (Milne, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Martin Roth on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David Martin Roth added to party Roof Club, LLC (pty:pla) (Roth, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Amended Complaint and Jury Demand upon Depositors Insurance Company on 09/28/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Depositors Insurance Company, filed by Roof Club, LLC.(alave, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katelyn Shea Werner on behalf of Depositors Insurance CompanyAttorney Katelyn Shea Werner added to party Depositors Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Depositors Insurance Company from Elbert County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30052. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7544933), filed by Depositors Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Palmeri, John) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Depositors Ins Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Roth