This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2020 at 08:04:04 (UTC).

Ronquillo v. Universal Recovery Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Ronquillo filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Universal Recovery Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Drozd and Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

Referral Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Becky E. Ronquillo

Defendant

Universal Recovery Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Michal Wajda

Attorney at Wajda Law Group, APC

6167 Bristol Parkway, Suite 200

Culver City, CA 90230

Defendant Attorneys

Mark E. Ellis

Attorney at Ellis Law Group, LLP

1425 River Park Drive, Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

Lawrence K. Iglesias

Attorney at Ellis Law Group, LLP

1425 River Park Dr., Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Universal Recovery Corporation. Attorney Iglesias, Lawrence K. added.(Iglesias, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Universal Recovery Corporation served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Universal Recovery Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nicholas Michal Wajda* *Wajda Law Group, APC* *6167 Bristol Parkway, Suite 200* *Culver City, CA 90230*. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

2 #4

VDRP

2 #3

Order re Consent

2 #2

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

2 #1

Standing Order

#2

(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Universal Recovery Corporation by Becky E. Ronquillo. Attorney Wajda, Nicholas Michal added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8744148) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Universal Recovery Corporation. Attorney Iglesias, Lawrence K. added.(Iglesias, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Universal Recovery Corporation served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Universal Recovery Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nicholas Michal Wajda* *Wajda Law Group, APC* *6167 Bristol Parkway, Suite 200* *Culver City, CA 90230*. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Universal Recovery Corporation by Becky E. Ronquillo. Attorney Wajda, Nicholas Michal added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8744148) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Recovery, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence K. Iglesias