This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2023 at 10:02:00 (UTC).

Ronnie Ortega v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 Ronnie Ortega filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-09228

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronnie Ortega

Defendant

TARGET CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Seyed Abbas Kazerounian

Adib Hashemi Assassi

Gil Melili

Jason A Ibey

Defendant Attorneys

Megan O'Neill

Erik Paul Mortensen

Lauren Hudecki

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MINUTES (In Chambers): by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement, (ECF No. #20 ), indicating that Plaintiff's individual claims have settled in their entirety, this action is placed on inactive status. Plaintiff'sMotion to Remand is DENIED AS MOOT. (ECF No. #13 .) All dates and deadlines in this actionare VACATED and taken off calendar. The parties are ORDERED to file, no later than April 13, 2023, a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. (lom) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

20 #1

Certificate of Service

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Settlement on an individual basis filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

19 #1

Certificate Of Service

#19

(#19) REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Santa Barbara #13 filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Of Service)(Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

13 #3

Certificate Of Service

13 #2

Proposed Order

13 #1

Memorandum

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Santa Barbara filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate Of Service) (Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

1 #9

Declaration Amiotte Declaration ISO Removal

1 #8

Exhibit 8 (State Court POS)

1 #7

Exhibit 7 (State Court Summons)

1 #6

Exhibit 6 (State Court Amended Order re CMC)

1 #5

Exhibit 5 (State Court Summons)

1 #4

Exhibit 4 (State Court Civil Cover Sheet Addendum)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 (State Court Order re CMC)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 (State Court Complaint)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 (State Court Civil Cover Sheet)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MINUTES (In Chambers): by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement, (ECF No. #20 ), indicating that Plaintiff's individual claims have settled in their entirety, this action is placed on inactive status. Plaintiff'sMotion to Remand is DENIED AS MOOT. (ECF No. #13 .) All dates and deadlines in this actionare VACATED and taken off calendar. The parties are ORDERED to file, no later than April 13, 2023, a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. (lom) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Settlement on an individual basis filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Santa Barbara #13 filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Of Service)(Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Santa Barbara #13 filed by Defendant Target Corporation. (O'Neill, Megan) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Target Corporation amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gil Melili counsel for Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega. Adding Gil Melili as counsel of record for Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Gil Melili added to party Ronnie Ortega(pty:pla))(Melili, Gil) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO STAY. The Court received and reviewed the parties' January 27, 2023 Joint Request to stay the case pending the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. After considering the Request, and in light of the fact that preparing a First Amended Complaint according to the Court's prior instructions does not appear to be an onerous task, the Court finds no good cause to grant the Request. The Request is DENIED #14 . Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint by no later than February 6, 2023. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute and failure to follow Court orders. (lc) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint REQUEST to Stay pending the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Demand Order on Motion to Dismiss, #12 Re: Deadline to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Santa Barbara filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate Of Service) (Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to the parties' Joint Request to Dismiss First Cause of Action, the Court hereby GRANTS the Request and DISMISSES Plaintiffs first cause of action WITHOUT PREJUDICE #11 . Plaintiff is ORDERED to file, no later than February 3, 2023, a First Amended Complaint that omits and reflects the dismissal of the first cause of action; the Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to amend for this purpose. (lc) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (sh) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega, upon Defendant Target Corporation served on 11/22/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT 12/07/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 8 EXHIBIT 8 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendant Target Corporation.Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Ortega.[FILED IN STATE COURT 10/31/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT 2 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION.(O'Neill, Megan) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 12/20/2022. (O'Neill, Megan) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION (O'Neill, Megan) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION. (O'Neill, Megan) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Santa Barbara, case number 22cv04262 Receipt No: ACACDC-34506031 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Civil Cover Sheet), #2 Exhibit 2 (State Court Complaint), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Order re CMC), #4 Exhibit 4 (State Court Civil Cover Sheet Addendum), #5 Exhibit 5 (State Court Summons), #6 Exhibit 6 (State Court Amended Order re CMC), #7 Exhibit 7 (State Court Summons), #8 Exhibit 8 (State Court POS), #9 Declaration Amiotte Declaration ISO Removal) (Attorney Megan O'Neill added to party TARGET CORPORATION(pty:dft))(O'Neill, Megan) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less