This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2020 at 09:32:35 (UTC).

Rondao Properties, LLC v. Scottsdale Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Rondao Properties, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Badalamenti and Nicholas P. Mizell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00572

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Badalamenti

Referral Judge

Nicholas P. Mizell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RONDAO PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendant

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neil V. Singh

Attorney at Law Offices of Neil V. Singh PA

10100 W. Sample Road, Third Floor

Coral Springs, FL 33065

Andres H. Lopez

Attorney at The Andres Lopez Law Firm PA

Suite 101, 7351 Wiles Road

Coral Springs, FL 33067

Neil Vijay Singh

Attorney at Law Offices of Neil V. Singh PA

10100 W. Sample Road, Third Floor

Coral Springs, FL 33065

Defendant Attorney

Julia Grimke Young

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

111 N. Orange Avenue, Suite 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of compliance Notice of Email Addresses by Rondao Properties, LLC (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #3 Amended Complaint by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Young, Julia) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andres H. Lopez on behalf of Rondao Properties, LLC (Lopez, Andres) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Louie Rondao, Other Affiliate Gina Rondao, Other Affiliate Bulldog Adjusting, Other Affiliate Stephen Lippy for Scottsdale Insurance Company.. (Young, Julia) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Young, Julia) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/11/2020. (WRW) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed in State Court on 6/30/20 by Rondao Properties, LLC.(drn) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #7

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County, case number 20CA-4232 filed in State Court on 06/30/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17149173 filed by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 State Court COMPLAINT, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Julia) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 10/14/2020 is rescheduledfor 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. The telephonic instructions still remain the same (Doc 8)(WRW) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of compliance Notice of Email Addresses by Rondao Properties, LLC (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE to counsel Neil Vijay Singh of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #3 Amended Complaint by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Young, Julia) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report and Pretrial & Discovery Plan by 10/7/2020. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 20572. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andres H. Lopez on behalf of Rondao Properties, LLC (Lopez, Andres) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Louie Rondao, Other Affiliate Gina Rondao, Other Affiliate Bulldog Adjusting, Other Affiliate Stephen Lippy for Scottsdale Insurance Company.. (Young, Julia) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Young, Julia) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/11/2020. (WRW) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed in State Court on 6/30/20 by Rondao Properties, LLC.(drn) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-572-FtM-66NPM. (SJB) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County, case number 20CA-4232 filed in State Court on 06/30/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17149173 filed by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 State Court COMPLAINT, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Julia) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil Singh(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andres H Lopez