This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2019 at 07:11:43 (UTC).

Ronald Thomas Poulson v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Ronald Thomas Poulson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01090

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Thomas Poulson

Hemet, CA 92545

Defendant

Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Scott Thomley

Attorney at Malcolm Cisneros ALC

2112 Business Center Drive 2Nd Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

William G Malcolm

Attorney at Malcolm Cisneros ALC

2112 Business Center Drive 2Nd Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) or (c) filed by Plaintiff Ronald Thomas Poulson. (iv) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #7 filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-01090 FMO (SHKx). (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on June 13, 2019. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, identifying Bayview MSR Opportunity Corp., et al.. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Deed of Trust

1 #2

Exhibit Proof of Service

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, case number MCC1900556 Receipt No: 0973-23914946 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Deed of Trust) (Attorney Brian Scott Thomley added to party Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft))(Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Pursuant to the Notice of Dismissal #11 filed by plaintiff, the Motion to Dismiss #7 is deemed moot and the case is hereby terminated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) or (c) filed by Plaintiff Ronald Thomas Poulson. (iv) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • (#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #7 filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-01090 FMO (SHKx). (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald Thomas Poulson, upon Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brian B., General Counsel in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/20/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2) (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF PETITION filed against Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, filed by Plaintiff Ronald Thomas Poulson. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/16/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on June 13, 2019. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, identifying Bayview MSR Opportunity Corp., et al.. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, case number MCC1900556 Receipt No: 0973-23914946 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Deed of Trust) (Attorney Brian Scott Thomley added to party Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft))(Thomley, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less