This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2020 at 07:13:48 (UTC).

Ronald Lee Adams v. J. Lewis et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Ronald Lee Adams filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against J Lewis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Frederick F. Mumm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10013

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Lee Adams

San Luis Obispo, CA 93409-8101

Defendants

V. Catalina

J. Lewis

Kathleen Allison

J. Castelo

B. Thompson

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge John A. Kronstadt: IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees #4 be DENIED for the following reasons: (See Order for further details) [ (CV-93). MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (yl) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lee Adams.(hr) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Ronald Adams re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lee Adams. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Temporary Injunction filed by plaintiff Ronald Lee Adams. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#8

(#8) **AMENDED** ORDER #7 RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge John A. Kronstadt. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filings Fees be DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. If Plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be dismissed. (See order for further details) (Case reopened) (yl) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING ORDER Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Plaintiff has made no showing that he will suffer irreparable harm if the injunction is not granted. The request for injunctive relief is DENIED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH DECEMBER 2, 2019 ORDER RE: IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION #9 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The Court GRANTS the motion as follows: plaintiff may submit the required documents on or before January 29, 2020. (hr) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Kathleen Allison, J. Castelo, V. Catalina(Correctional Officer, official capacity), V. Catalina(individual), J. Lewis, B. Thompson pursuant to Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F Mumm., filed by plaintiff Ronald Lee Adams. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH DECEMBER 2, 2019 ORDER RE: IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION #9 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The Court GRANTS the motion as follows: plaintiff may submit the required documents on or before January 29, 2020. (hr) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lee Adams.(hr) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) **AMENDED** ORDER #7 RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge John A. Kronstadt. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filings Fees be DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. If Plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be dismissed. (See order for further details) (Case reopened) (yl) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge John A. Kronstadt: IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees #4 be DENIED for the following reasons: (See Order for further details) [ (CV-93). MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (yl) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Re NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) #4 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(jm) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING ORDER Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Plaintiff has made no showing that he will suffer irreparable harm if the injunction is not granted. The request for injunctive relief is DENIED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(jm) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Temporary Injunction filed by plaintiff Ronald Lee Adams. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DECLARATION of Ronald Adams re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Lee Adams. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Kathleen Allison, J. Castelo, V. Catalina(Correctional Officer, official capacity), V. Catalina(individual), J. Lewis, B. Thompson pursuant to Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F Mumm., filed by plaintiff Ronald Lee Adams. (ghap) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.