This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:42:48 (UTC).

Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 Ron White, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Pandora Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00813

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ron White, Inc.

Defendant

Pandora Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Steven Busch

Attorney at King and Ballow

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Paul M. Fakler

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1001

John Nadolenco

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

350 South Grand Avenue 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASESThe Court ordered the parties to show cause why it should not join thefollowing cases: Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809- MCS-MAR ; Main Sequence, LTDv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR; Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR ; Robin Williams Trustv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MA; Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00817-MAR. The plaintiffs to these actions responded that joinder under Rule 20(a)(1) was inappropriate and instead requested consolidation for all pretrial matters. See, e.g., Resp. to OSC, ECF No. 13, Yellow Rose Prods., No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR. The Court discharges the OSC and consolidates the cases for all pretrial matters/ For the same reasons as above, on its own motion the Court also consolidatesthese cases with the following case: Nick Di Paolo v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-01345-MCS-MAR. The Court orders the following: (1) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. PandoraMedia, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR, Main Sequence, LTD v. PandoraMedia, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR, Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media,LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR, Robin Williams Trust v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MAR, Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22- cv-00817-MCS-MAR, and Nick Di Paolo v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv- 01345-MCS-MAR, are consolidated for pretrial purposes and should be captioned (3) Within seven days of this order, Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated complaint in the master file. Defendants response to the consolidated complaint shall be due under the timelines dictated by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules.(SEE DOCUMENT FOR REQUIRED CAPTION AS ORDERED HERE (2) The file in Case No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR shall constitute the master file for every action in the consolidated action. The Clerk shall administratively close the other actions.. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul M. Fakler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pandora Media, LLC and designating John Nadolenco as local counsel #19 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

19 #1

Proposed Order

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC identifying Sirius XM Radio Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pandora Media, LLC answer now due 4/7/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC.(Attorney John Nadolenco added to party Pandora Media, LLC(pty:dft))(Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

16 #2

Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Response to OSC re Joinder

16 #1

Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Response to OSC re Joinder

#13

(#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE JOINDER. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the following cases should not be joined under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 20(a)(l ): Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR; Main Sequence, LTD v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR; Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR; Robin Williams Trustv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MAR; Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00817-MCS-MAR. Plaintiff shall either explain why the cases should not be joined as a single action or consent to joinder. Plaintiff shall respond within seven days of this order. (lc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#8

(#8) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Ron White, Inc.. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ron White, Inc.. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ron White, Inc., (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ron White, Inc.. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASESThe Court ordered the parties to show cause why it should not join thefollowing cases: Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809- MCS-MAR ; Main Sequence, LTDv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR; Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR ; Robin Williams Trustv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MA; Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00817-MAR. The plaintiffs to these actions responded that joinder under Rule 20(a)(1) was inappropriate and instead requested consolidation for all pretrial matters. See, e.g., Resp. to OSC, ECF No. 13, Yellow Rose Prods., No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR. The Court discharges the OSC and consolidates the cases for all pretrial matters/ For the same reasons as above, on its own motion the Court also consolidatesthese cases with the following case: Nick Di Paolo v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-01345-MCS-MAR. The Court orders the following: (1) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. PandoraMedia, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR, Main Sequence, LTD v. PandoraMedia, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR, Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media,LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR, Robin Williams Trust v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MAR, Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22- cv-00817-MCS-MAR, and Nick Di Paolo v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv- 01345-MCS-MAR, are consolidated for pretrial purposes and should be captioned (3) Within seven days of this order, Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated complaint in the master file. Defendants response to the consolidated complaint shall be due under the timelines dictated by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules.(SEE DOCUMENT FOR REQUIRED CAPTION AS ORDERED HERE (2) The file in Case No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR shall constitute the master file for every action in the consolidated action. The Clerk shall administratively close the other actions.. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul M. Fakler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pandora Media, LLC and designating John Nadolenco as local counsel #19 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul M. Fakler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pandora Media, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32864569) filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC identifying Sirius XM Radio Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pandora Media, LLC answer now due 4/7/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC.(Attorney John Nadolenco added to party Pandora Media, LLC(pty:dft))(Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ron White, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #13 [Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Joinder] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Response to OSC re Joinder, #2 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Response to OSC re Joinder)(Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ron White, Inc., upon Defendant Pandora Media, LLC served on 2/15/2022, answer due 3/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Pandora Media, LLC. (lc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE JOINDER. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the following cases should not be joined under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 20(a)(l ): Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR; Main Sequence, LTD v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR; Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR; Robin Williams Trustv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MAR; Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00817-MCS-MAR. Plaintiff shall either explain why the cases should not be joined as a single action or consent to joinder. Plaintiff shall respond within seven days of this order. (lc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ron White, Inc.. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:22-cv-00809 MCS(MARx). Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-00813 MCS(MARx). Signed by Judge Mark C. Scarsi (rn) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Ron White, Inc.. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ron White, Inc.. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ron White, Inc., (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ron White, Inc.. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32746024 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Ron White, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Ron White, Inc.(pty:pla))(Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pandora Media, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul M. Fakler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Nadolenco