This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2020 at 07:44:59 (UTC).

Romine et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Romine filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04766

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Evangelina Loria

Elena Romine

Defendant

Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Papa Magaye Dieye

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2616 S Loop West, Ste 550

Houston, TX 77054

Defendant Attorney

Colleen McKnight

Attorney at Foley Gardere

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77002-2009

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM Regarding Case Status re: #9 Order, by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., filed.(McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Papa M. Dieye to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#9

(#9) Management ORDER. By 2/3/2020, the parties must jointly report the status of this case and the next steps to advance this litigation. By 2/14/2020, Wyndham may answer or otherwise respond. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Initial conference held. Appearances: Papa Dieye, Colleen McKnight. Ct Reporter: J. Sanchez. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 2/10/2020. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Papa Dieye to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evangelina Loria, Elena Romine, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2020. (JenniferOlson, 4) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Extension ORDER. By 1/10/2020, Wyndham Vacation Resorts may answer or otherwise respond #5 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Original Petition by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Order: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. identifying Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Exhibit Index

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court, case number 2019-81712 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23718423) filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM Regarding Case Status re: #9 Order, by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., filed.(McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Papa M. Dieye to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Management ORDER. By 2/3/2020, the parties must jointly report the status of this case and the next steps to advance this litigation. By 2/14/2020, Wyndham may answer or otherwise respond. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Initial conference held. Appearances: Papa Dieye, Colleen McKnight. Ct Reporter: J. Sanchez. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 2/10/2020. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Papa Dieye to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evangelina Loria, Elena Romine, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2020. (JenniferOlson, 4) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Extension ORDER. By 1/10/2020, Wyndham Vacation Resorts may answer or otherwise respond #5 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Original Petition by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. identifying Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court, case number 2019-81712 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23718423) filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colleen McKnight