This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:09:13 (UTC).

Romero v. The One Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Romero filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against The One Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George B. Daniels. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07864

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josue Romero

Defendant

The One Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph H Mizrahi

Attorney at Cohen & Mizrahi LLP

300 Cadman Plaza West, 12Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Letter filed by The One Group, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. The One Group, LLC answer due 12/4/2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/28/2020) (cf) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#7

(#7) LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Mark Cuccaro dated 10/26/2020 re: Extension of Time to Answer. Document filed by The One Group, LLC..(Cuccaro, Mark) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The One Group, LLC served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. Service was accepted by Kamesha James, Agent. Document filed by Josue Romero..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#5

(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The One Group, LLC..(gp) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The One Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Josue Romero..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The One Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21810588)Document filed by Josue Romero..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Letter filed by The One Group, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. The One Group, LLC answer due 12/4/2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/28/2020) (cf) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Mark Cuccaro dated 10/26/2020 re: Extension of Time to Answer. Document filed by The One Group, LLC..(Cuccaro, Mark) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The One Group, LLC served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. Service was accepted by Kamesha James, Agent. Document filed by Josue Romero..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The One Group, LLC..(gp) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The One Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Josue Romero..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The One Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21810588)Document filed by Josue Romero..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The One Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph H Mizrahi