This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2022 at 10:11:43 (UTC).

Romano v. Lordstown Motors Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Romano filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Lordstown Motors Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Adams and Patricia A. Gaughan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00994

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John R. Adams

Patricia A. Gaughan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raymond Romano

Petitioners

Globestar Systems Inc.

Daniel Tavares

Defendants

David T. Hamamoto

Mark A. Walsh

Steven R. Hash

Stephen S. Burns

Lordstown Motors Corporation

Andrew C. Richardson

Judith A. Hannaway

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph E. White, III

Attorney at Saxena White

150 East Palmetto Park Road

Boca Raton, FL 33432

David R. Kaplan

Attorney at Saxena White - San Diego

12750 High Bluff Drive

San Diego, CA 92130

Maya Saxena

Attorney at Saxena White

150 East Palmetto Park Road

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Lester R. Hooker

Attorney at Saxena White

150 East Palmetto Park Road

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Scott D. Simpkins

Attorney at Climaco, Wilcox, Peca, Tarantino & Garofoli - Cleveland

55 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44113

Steven B. Singer

Attorney at Saxena White - New York

8Th Floor, 10 Bank Street

New York, NY 10606

Petitioner Attorney

James B. Rosenthal

Attorney at Cohen, Rosenthal & Kramer

1 Clinton Place, 3208 Clinton Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#4

#32

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Non-Opposition of movants to competing motion of George Troicky for appointment as lead Plaintiff and selection of lead counsel, filed by Globestar Systems Inc., Daniel Tavares. (Rosenthal, James) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketRandom Re-Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,TL) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketJudge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. Judge John R. Adams terminated. (M,TL) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan for all further proceedings as related to case 4:21CV616. Judge John R. Adams on 5/18/21. (K,C) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to consolidate cases , Motion for appointment of counsel and Lead Plaintiffs filed by Daniel Tavares, Globestar Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Support, #3 Rosenthal Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #5 Exhibit 2 - Movants' PSLRA Certifications, #6 Exhibit 3 - Movants' Loss Chart, #7 Exhibit 4 - RLF Firm Resume, #8 Exhibit 5 - CRK Firm Resume)(Rosenthal, James) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Steven B. Singer. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Lester R. Hooker. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Joseph E. White, III. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Maya Saxena. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice to Attorney David R. Kaplan. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,Ju) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (D,Ju) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketJudge John R. Adams assigned to case. (D,Ju) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Class Action Complaint for Violations of The Federal Securities Laws with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10830942. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 4:21-cv-00616. Filed by Raymond Romano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons) (Simpkins, Scott) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James B. Rosenthal