This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2023 at 01:27:39 (UTC).

Romano v. C.R. Bard, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 Romano filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven I. Locke and Rachel P. Kovner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04782

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven I. Locke

Presiding Judge

Rachel P. Kovner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maryanne Romano

Defendant

C.R. Bard, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Rocco Farnolo

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel I.A. Smulian

Dale Goldstein

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to C.R. Bard, Inc. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT Maryanne Romano against C.R. Bard, Inc., filed by Maryanne Romano. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Maryanne Romano (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel I.A. Smulian on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Smulian, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Goldstein on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Goldstein, Dale) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against C.R. Bard, Inc., filed by Maryanne Romano. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maryanne Romano. C.R. Bard, Inc. served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against C.R. Bard, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Maryanne Romano. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) Notice of MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement the Plaintiff's Complaint by Maryanne Romano. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint) (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

6 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maryanne Romano. C.R. Bard, Inc. served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against C.R. Bard, Inc., filed by Maryanne Romano. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER: In light of the joint stipulation at #9 , the motion to amend the complaint at #6 is granted, and defendant's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended until November 7, 2022. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 9/6/2022. (Andrews, Stephen) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Goldstein on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Goldstein, Dale) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STIPULATION re #6 Notice of MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement the Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint by C.R. Bard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint) (Smulian, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel I.A. Smulian on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Smulian, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Maryanne Romano (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Notice of MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement the Plaintiff's Complaint by Maryanne Romano. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint) (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT Maryanne Romano against C.R. Bard, Inc., filed by Maryanne Romano. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff asserts diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. See Compl. 14 (Dkt. #1). For diversity jurisdiction to exist, the controversy must be completely diverse, meaning that all plaintiffs must be citizens of different states from all defendants. 28 U.S.C. 1332(a)(1); Lincoln Prop. Co. v. Roche, 546 U.S. 81, 89 (2005). Plaintiff's complaint alleges that plaintiff is a citizen of New Jersey. See Compl. 1. Plaintiff also alleges that defendant is a corporation "based out of New Jersey" and "with its corporate headquarters" in "New Jersey." See Compl. 2. Accordingly, plaintiff must file a letter showing cause as to whether diversity jurisdiction exists by 8/22/2022. Otherwise, the case shall be dismissed. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 8/16/2022. (Andrews, Stephen) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to C.R. Bard, Inc. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022

DocketFILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-15843878 (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against C.R. Bard, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Maryanne Romano. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less