This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:15:21 (UTC).

Roman v. Law Offices of Holmes, Rich & Sigler, P.C. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Roman filed an Other lawsuit against Law Offices of Holmes, Rich Sigler, P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Mark S. Norris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02837

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheila Roman

Defendants

R. Bradley Sigler

Law Offices of Holmes, Rich & Sigler, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Michael Panvini

Attorney at THOMPSON CUNSUMER LAW FIRM, PLLC

5235 E. Southern Ave., D106-618

Mesa, AZ 85206

Defendant Attorneys

Milton Dale Conder, Jr.

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL

209 E. Main St., P.O. Box 1147

Jackson, TN 38302-1147

John D. Burleson

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL

209 E. Main Street

Jackson, TN 38301

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Certificate of Consultation

12 #1

Memorandum

#12

(#12) First MOTION to Extend Deadline proposed order submitted by Law Offices of Holmes, Rich & Sigler, P.C., R. Bradley Sigler. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Conder, Milton) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

11 #1

Summons Returned Executed (Sigler)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheila Roman as to Law Offices of Holmes, Rich & Sigler, P.C., R. Bradley Sigler. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed (Sigler))(Panvini, Joseph) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Burleson on behalf of All Defendants (Burleson, John) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to R. Bradley Sigler. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Law Offices of Holmes, Rich & Sigler, P.C.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Panvini on behalf of Sheila Roman (Panvini, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #4

Summons Sigler

1 #3

Summons HRS

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - December 7, 2018 Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Law Offices of Holmes, Rich & Sigler, P.C., R. Bradley Sigler (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3231164), filed by Sheila Roman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - December 7, 2018 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons HRS, #4 Summons Sigler)(Panvini, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendants' answer or other response to the Complaint is now due by February 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 1/6/2020. (Norris, Mark) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First MOTION to Extend Deadline proposed order submitted by Law Offices of Holmes, Rich & Sigler, P.C., R. Bradley Sigler. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Conder, Milton) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheila Roman as to Law Offices of Holmes, Rich & Sigler, P.C., R. Bradley Sigler. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed (Sigler))(Panvini, Joseph) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Milton Dale Conder, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Conder, Milton) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Burleson on behalf of All Defendants (Burleson, John) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to R. Bradley Sigler. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Law Offices of Holmes, Rich & Sigler, P.C.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Panvini on behalf of Sheila Roman (Panvini, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Law Offices of Holmes, Rich & Sigler, P.C., R. Bradley Sigler (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3231164), filed by Sheila Roman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - December 7, 2018 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons HRS, #4 Summons Sigler)(Panvini, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.