This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2020 at 07:06:08 (UTC).

Roman v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 Roman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein and Frederic Block. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00920

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James Orenstein

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Roman

Defendant

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Elefterakis

Attorney at Elefterakis Elefterakis & Panek P.C.

80 Pine Street, 38Th Flr.

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorneys

Cheyna Rivka Volkov

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

77 Water Street, Ste 2100

New York, NY 10038

Michael Nathan Giacopelli

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

77 Water Street, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10005

David M. Pollack

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

77 Water Street, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10038

Meagan M. Kelly

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

77 Water Street, Suite 2100, New York

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION to Adjourn Conference LETTER TO JUDGE ORENSTEIN re REQUEST FOR ADJOURNMENT OF INITIAL CONFERENCE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Kelly, Meagan) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to attend an initial discovery planning conference on April 16, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. that will take place telephonically. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 391-4302. I respectfully direct all counsel to call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. If any party has any difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. No later than April 14, 2020, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/1/2020. (Almonte, Kelly) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Meagan M. Kelly on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kelly, Meagan) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. Additionally, case is reassigned to Office Code 1: Brooklyn as per civil cover sheet Rule 50.1(d)(2). (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Giacopelli, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - Email Confirmation for Counsel

1 #5

Exhibit E - Letter to counsel re Request for Written Confirmation of Damages

1 #4

Exhibit D - Demand for Supplemental Statement of Damages

1 #3

Exhibit C - Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Verifi

1 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from NY Supreme, case number 714473/2019. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-12420042) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Demand for Supplemental Statement of Damages, #5 ExhibitE - Letter to counsel re Request for Written Confirmation of Damages exceeding $75,000, #6 Exhibit F - Email Confirmation for Counsel, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Giacopelli, Michael) Modified on 2/20/2020 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 02/20/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #7 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted on consent. The telephone initial conference previously scheduled for April 16, 2020 is rescheduled for May 5, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/13/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Adjourn Conference LETTER TO JUDGE ORENSTEIN re REQUEST FOR ADJOURNMENT OF INITIAL CONFERENCE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Kelly, Meagan) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to attend an initial discovery planning conference on April 16, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. that will take place telephonically. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 391-4302. I respectfully direct all counsel to call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. If any party has any difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. No later than April 14, 2020, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/1/2020. (Almonte, Kelly) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Meagan M. Kelly on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kelly, Meagan) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. Additionally, case is reassigned to Office Code 1: Brooklyn as per civil cover sheet Rule 50.1(d)(2). (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Giacopelli, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from NY Supreme, case number 714473/2019. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-12420042) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Demand for Supplemental Statement of Damages, #5 ExhibitE - Letter to counsel re Request for Written Confirmation of Damages exceeding $75,000, #6 Exhibit F - Email Confirmation for Counsel, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Giacopelli, Michael) Modified on 2/20/2020 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meagan Marie Kelly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheyna Rivka Volkov

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Nathan Giacopelli