This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2019 at 07:45:48 (UTC).

Roman v. Saul

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Roman filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Timothy J. Cavan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Timothy J. Cavan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jovone Roman

Billings, MT 59102

Defendants

Nancy Ann Berryhill

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Victoria L. Francis

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - BILLINGS

2601 Second Avenue North, Suite 3200

Billings, MT 59101

Franco Luciano Becia

701 5Th Ave., Suite 2900, M/S 221A

Seattle, WA 98104-7075

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/10/2019. (JEC) Modified on 6/10/2019 - Sent via US Mail to plaintiff (JEC). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #1

Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Se

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/10/2019. (Documents forwarded to the US Attorney General, US Attorney and Nancy A Berryhill, as directed.) (JDR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2019: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service) (JDR). (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Andrew Saul added to case as Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Nancy A. Berryhill (Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration) terminated. (CDH) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/10/2019. (JEC) Modified on 6/10/2019 - Sent via US Mail to plaintiff (JEC). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Electronic Mailing of Consent Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Victoria L. Francis, Franco Luciano Becia. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/10/2019. Sent via US Mail to plaintiff. (JEC) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Nancy Ann Berryhill (Becia, Franco) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF REGARDING CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE. (current copy of docket sheet; orders and notice mailed to pro se plaintiff) (AMC) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nancy Ann Berryhill. (AEC) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/10/2019. (Documents forwarded to the US Attorney General, US Attorney and Nancy A Berryhill, as directed.) (JDR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2019: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service) (JDR). (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail. (AMC) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-mail by Jovone Roman. (AMC) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING LETTER with a consent to electronic service. Pro Se Plaintiff accompanied with his filings a filled out consent; Clerk will send out notification advising pro se plaintiff that the Pro Se Consent for Electronic Filing cannot be used because restriction levels in social security cases will not allow a non-registered user to access documents sent via an NEF. (AMC) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF A SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY OR SUPPLEMENTAL SECURITY INCOME DECISION against Nancy Ann Berryhill filed by Jovone Roman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Request to Waive Service of Summons, #3 Proposed Waiver of Service of Summons) (AMC) Modified on 5/10/2019 - Complaint deemed filed (JDR). (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jovone Roman Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (AMC) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less