Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2020 at 09:28:12 (UTC).

Roman Teroganesyan v. Ferrari North America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 Roman Teroganesyan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ferrari North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04588

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roman Teroganesyan

Defendants

Passione Rossa, LLC

Ferrari North America, Inc.

Does 1 to 25, inclusive

Passione Rossa, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Ferrari of Beverly Hills

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel S Imber

Attorney at Imber Law Group APC

9454 Wilshire Bouelvard Penthouse

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Harry S Kaloustian

Attorney at Kaloustian Law Group APC

6320 Canoga Avenue Suite 630

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorneys

Hannah Lee Mohrman

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

970 West 190Th Street Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90502

Richard L Stuhlbarg

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

970 West 190Th Street Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90502

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 1/19/21. (rfi) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#10

(#10) Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2021 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#8

(#8) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Defendants Ferrari North America, Inc., Passione Rossa, LLC.. (Mohrman, Hannah) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Ferrari North America, Inc., Ferrari of Beverly Hills. (Mohrman, Hannah) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Ferrari North America, Inc., Ferrari of Beverly Hills, (Mohrman, Hannah) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

1 #1

Declaration of Hannah L. Mohrman

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV14595 Receipt No: ACACDC-26525776 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Ferrari North America, Inc., Ferrari of Beverly Hills. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hannah L. Mohrman) (Attorney Hannah Lee Mohrman added to party Ferrari North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Hannah Lee Mohrman added to party Ferrari of Beverly Hills(pty:dft))(Mohrman, Hannah) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 1/19/21. (rfi) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2021 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Defendants Ferrari North America, Inc., Passione Rossa, LLC.. (Mohrman, Hannah) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, Jury Demand, filed by defendant Passione Rossa, LLC. (filed in state court 5/20/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 80)(esa) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, Jury Demand, filed by defendant Ferrari North America, Inc. (filed in state court 5/5/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 73)(esa) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Roman Teroganesyan, upon Defendant Ferrari North America, Inc. served on 4/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 5) (esa) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Ferrari North America, Inc., Passione Rossa, LLC, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Roman Teroganesyan. (filed in state court 4/15/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 7) (esa) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Ferrari North America, Inc., Ferrari of Beverly Hills. (Mohrman, Hannah) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Ferrari North America, Inc., Ferrari of Beverly Hills, (Mohrman, Hannah) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV14595 Receipt No: ACACDC-26525776 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Ferrari North America, Inc., Ferrari of Beverly Hills. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hannah L. Mohrman) (Attorney Hannah Lee Mohrman added to party Ferrari North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Hannah Lee Mohrman added to party Ferrari of Beverly Hills(pty:dft))(Mohrman, Hannah) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASSIONE ROSSA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA FERRARI OF BEVERLY HILLS is a litigant

Latest cases where Ferrari North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel S Imber

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harry S Kaloustian