This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2021 at 08:23:22 (UTC).

Roman Mateo v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Roman Mateo filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81742

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raquel Roman Mateo

Defendants

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation

Inc Pfizer

Sanofi US Services Inc.,

SANOFI S.A

SANOFI-AVENTIC U.S. LLC

Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Methapharm, Inc.

Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.

Ajanta Pharma Ltd.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging

American Health Packaging

76 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan

Attorney at Quetglas Law Office P.S.C.

1353 Luis Vigoreaux Ave., Pmb 669

Guaynabo, PR 00966

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Category Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#5

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Certified CTO

6 #2

List of Tag-Along Actions

7 #7

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

7 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#10) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#9) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01388 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81742-RLR Roman Mateo v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 9/16/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 75. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#8) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:21-cv-01388. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TRANSMITTAL Letter to the District Southern District of Florida, transferee court, with certified copy of CTO-75 in MDL 2924 and List of Tag-Along Actions. Their case number for this case is 20-md-02924 RLR. The Presiding Judge is Hon. Robin L. Rosenberg. This case is hereby closed. (Attachments: #1 Certified CTO, #2 List of Tag-Along Actions) (idg) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION RE: MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - entered in MDL No. 2924 informing of the electronic transfer to the Southern District of Florida. The Order becomes effective upon receipt of a certified copy of CTO-75 from the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 9/10/2021. (idg) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION RE: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-75) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL No. 2924. Signed by the Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel, John W. Nichols on 9/10/2021. (idg) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7421544.), filed by Raquel Roman Mateo. Service due by 11/18/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Methapharm, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging is a litigant

Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH is a litigant