This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2019 at 08:45:05 (UTC).

Rollins v. Miles College

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Rollins filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Miles College. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John H England, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01788

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John H England, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justin Rollins

Defendant

Miles College

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Connie J Morrow

Attorney at CJ MORROW CARRAWAY BAKER LAW LLC

P.O. Box 640

Wetumpka, AL 36092

Defendant Attorneys

Robert M Ronnlund

Attorney at SCOTT SULLIVAN STREETMAN & FOX PC

P.O. Box 380548

Birmingham, AL 35238

William A Scott, Jr

Attorney at SCOTT SULLIVAN STREETMAN & FOX PC

2450 Valleydale Road

Birmingham, AL 35244

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/30/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than February 6, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after February 6, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on January 22, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/30/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Miles College. filed by Miles College (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by William A Scott, Jr on behalf of Miles College (Scott, William) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Miles College. (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M Ronnlund on behalf of Miles College (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Miles College mailed cerified mail. (AKD) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to a Magistrate Judge in a civil action. (AKD) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Miles College filed by Justin Rollins.(AKD) Modified on 11/4/2019 (AKD, ). (Entered: 11/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/30/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than February 6, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after February 6, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on January 22, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/30/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Miles College. filed by Miles College (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by William A Scott, Jr on behalf of Miles College (Scott, William) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline for #5 Motion to Dismiss. Any opposition to the motion must be filed by January 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 12/24/2019. (CLS2) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Miles College. (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M Ronnlund on behalf of Miles College (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Miles College mailed cerified mail. (AKD) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601101987 (AKD) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to a Magistrate Judge in a civil action. (AKD) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Miles College filed by Justin Rollins.(AKD) Modified on 11/4/2019 (AKD, ). (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miles College is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Connie J. Morrow