This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2019 at 07:04:12 (UTC).

Rollins et al v. Cole et al (PLR3)

Case Summary

On 10/05/2019 Rollins filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Cole PLR3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00282

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amanda Rollins

Jill Franklin

Defendants

Polk County Board of Education

Treva Hyatt

Kelly Kimsey

Robert Cole

Nathan Henderson

James Jones

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Tyler Weiss

Attorney at Worthington & Weiss, P.C.

409 N College Street, Suite 1

Madisonville, TN 37354

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth S Williams

Attorney at Madewell, Jared, Halfacre, Williams & Wilson

230 North Washington Avenue

Cookeville, TN 38501

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#31

(#31) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#30

(#30) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#29

(#29) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#28

(#28) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#27

(#27) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#26

(#26) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#25

(#25) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#24

(#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

7 #5

Summons

7 #4

Summons

6 #1

Supplement Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #7 Supplement, #6 Supplement : Informational for future filings. (AML) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/7/19. (GRE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/7/19. (GRE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/7/19. (GRE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint. (GRE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#1

(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 COMPLAINT Summons to Defendants by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Weiss, William) Modified on 10/7/2019 to correct link to proper document (AML). (Entered: 10/07/2019)

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Weiss, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #20 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #22 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #18 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #17 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #16 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #21 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #19 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #14 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #15 Summons Returned Executed as to USA : requirements due by 11/25/2019. (AML) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #7 Supplement, #6 Supplement : Informational for future filings. (AML) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 COMPLAINT Summons to Defendants by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Weiss, William) Modified on 10/7/2019 to correct link to proper document (AML). (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENT to #1 COMPLAINT Civil Cover Sheet by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiss, William) Modified on 10/7/2019 to correct the link to proper document (AML). (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/7/19. (GRE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/7/19. (GRE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/7/19. (GRE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (GRE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint. (GRE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (GRE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4097116.), filed by Jill Franklin, Amanda Rollins.(Weiss, William) (Entered: 10/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth S. Williams