This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2021 at 09:40:26 (UTC).

Rolling Hills Condominium Homeowners' Association v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Rolling Hills Condominium Homeowners' Association filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01136

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rolling Hills Condominium Homeowners' Association

Defendants

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Doe Insurance Companies 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cortney Feniello

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Daniel Stein

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Jerry H. Stein

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Justin D Sudweeks

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Defendant Attorneys

Jason E Vacha

Attorney at REED MCCLURE

1215 Fourth Ave, Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98161

Michael Simpson Rogers

Attorney at REED MCCLURE

1215 Fourth Ave, Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98161

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

#10

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7-10. (Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/6/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/13/2021, Joint Status Report due by 10/20/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Michael Simpson Rogers added for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company; per #6 Notice of Appearance. (SB) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason E Vacha on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Vacha, Jason) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rolling Hills Condominium Homeowners' Association (Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (SG) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/1/2021. (SG) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (SG) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-01171-BAT, by Plaintiff Rolling Hills Condominium Homeowners' Association. (Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7219953), filed by Rolling Hills Condominium Homeowners' Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less