This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2021 at 08:03:03 (UTC).

Rollerking Ltd., c/o Barry Taft v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Rollerking Ltd , c/o Barry Taft filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael M. Mihm, Jonathan E. Hawley, Sue E. Myerscough and Tom Schanzle-Haskins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01142

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michael M. Mihm

Sue E. Myerscough

Referral Judges

Jonathan E. Hawley

Tom Schanzle-Haskins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rollerking Ltd., c/o Barry Taft

Rollerking Ltd.

Defendant

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Joseph Ricci

Attorney at DELANO LAW OFFICES PC

One Southeast Old State Capitol Plaza

Springfield, IL 62701

Defendant Attorney

Dennis M Dolan

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO

303 W Madison St

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel The Cincinnati Insurance Companys Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Dennis M Dolan on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rollerking Ltd. (Ricci, Andrew) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#5

(#5) DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Rollerking Ltd.. (Ricci, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Defendant, The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Dennis M Dolan on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Supporting documents

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint from State Court

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sangamon County, case number 2021 L 000047 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3654095), filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint from State Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - Supporting documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel The Cincinnati Insurance Companys Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Dennis M Dolan on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rollerking Ltd. (Ricci, Andrew) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Tuesday, 7/13/2021, at 11:00 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Discovery plan has been filed by the parties. (LB) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Rollerking Ltd.. (Ricci, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins added. (MJC) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff filed this action in the Circuit Court of Sangamon County, Illinois. The Defendant Filed a Notice of Removal #1 in the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Peoria Division. It appears the Defendant filed in the Peoria Division inadvertently as the caption of the Notice of Removal identifies the Springfield Division of this Court. Per 28 U.S.C. 1446(a), the Springfield Division is the correct one. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Springfield Division of this Court. See CDIL-LR 40.1(B) Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/7/2021. (KZ) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Defendant, The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Dennis M Dolan on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sangamon County, case number 2021 L 000047 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3654095), filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint from State Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - Supporting documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant