This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/07/2020 at 08:06:21 (UTC).

Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. v. Raytheon Company

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Raytheon Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10889

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.

Defendants

Raytheon Technologies Corporation

Raytheon Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James F. Radke

Attorney at Murtha Cullina LLP

99 High Street

Boston, MA 02110

David P. Friedman

Attorney at Murtha Cullina LLP

177 Broad Street, 16Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901

Richard J. Basile

Attorney at Murtha Cullina LLP

177 Broad Street, 16Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901

Lorey R. Leddy

Attorney at Murtha Cullina LLP

177 Broad Street, 16Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth A. Alquist

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

242 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Woo Sin Sean Park

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

242 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Jonathan I. Handler

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

One International Place

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

16 #1

Exhibit A Certification of Richard J. Basile

#16

15 #1

Exhibit A Certification of Attorney David P. Friedman

14 #1

Exhibit A Certification of Attorney Lorey Leddy

#14

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • Docket(#22) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 7/6/2020. Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. Court adopted proposed dates. Def. had no obj. to case name change to Raytheon Company per Amend. Complaint; counsel shall note their appearance for same with next filings. Parties to jointly report to clerk any request for ADR. Discovery to be completed by 1/15/2021, Status Conference set for 1/19/2021 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Scheduling order to follow. (Court Reporter: Robert Paschal rwp.reporter@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Radke, Leddy, Alquist, Handler, Park) (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Raytheon Company, filed by Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc..(Radke, James) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Handler, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Radke, James) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Radke, James) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lorey R. Leddy.; ALLOWING #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David P. Friedman.; ALLOWING #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard J. Basile. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard J. Basile Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8283612 by Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certification of Richard J. Basile)(Radke, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David P. Friedman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8283607 by Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certification of Attorney David P. Friedman)(Radke, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lorey Rives Leddy Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8283603 by Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certification of Attorney Lorey Leddy)(Radke, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $100.00 paid on 05/28/2020, receipt number 0101-8261086. (Tran, Henry) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Woo Sin Sean Park Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8261089 by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Handler, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth A. Alquist Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8261081 by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Handler, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 2, 2020 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by Raytheon Technologies Corporation.(Handler, Jonathan) Modified on 5/29/2020 : Corrected event type (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Handler, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan I. Handler on behalf of Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Handler, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Raytheon Technologies Corporation served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (Radke, James) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Raytheon Technologies Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent RBC Bearings Incorporated for Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc... (Radke, James) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Raytheon Technologies Corporation Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8234047 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Form, #3 Exhibit A)(Radke, James) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Raytheon Technologies Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RAYTHEON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Ann Alquist