This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:25:57 (UTC).

Roll v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Roll filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against United States Department of Veterans Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02825

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stewart D Roll

Defendant

United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott D. Simpkins

Attorney at Climaco, Wilcox, Peca, Tarantino & Garofoli - Cleveland

55 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorneys

David M. DeVito

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

James R. Bennett, II

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

3 #2

Summons for U.S. Attorney N.D. Ohio

#10

(#10) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 27, 2020 within which to file its answer or other responsive pleading in this case filed by Defendant United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

3 #1

Summons for U.S. Attorney General

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs on 12/16/2019, filed on behalf of Stewart D Roll Related document(s) #4 . (W,CM) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A - FOIA request

#6

(#6) Return of Service by Clerk by Certified Mail executed upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs, c/o U.S. Attorney General on 12/17/2019 filed on behalf of Stewart D Roll Related document(s) #4 . (J,G) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#9

(#9) Attorney Appearance by David M. DeVito filed by on behalf of United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (DeVito, David) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #4

Summons

#2

(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Stewart D Roll. (Attachments: #1 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons for U.S. Attorney N.D. Ohio)(Simpkins, Scott) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#11

(#11) Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 27, 2020. Judge John R. Adams on 1/24/20.(K,C) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#4

(#4) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs c/o U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (T,Je) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint against United States Department of Veterans Affairs. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9662232.. Filed by Stewart D Roll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FOIA request, #2 Exhibit B - USDVA acknowledgment of receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Simpkins, Scott) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 27, 2020. Judge John R. Adams on 1/24/20.(K,C) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 27, 2020 within which to file its answer or other responsive pleading in this case filed by Defendant United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Attorney Appearance by David M. DeVito filed by on behalf of United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (DeVito, David) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Appearance filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs on 12/31/2019, filed on behalf of Stewart D Roll Related document(s) #2 . (J,FE) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service by Clerk by Certified Mail executed upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs, c/o U.S. Attorney General on 12/17/2019 filed on behalf of Stewart D Roll Related document(s) #4 . (J,G) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs on 12/16/2019, filed on behalf of Stewart D Roll Related document(s) #4 . (W,CM) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to United States Department of Veterans Affairs, c/o Attorney General, receipt # 70161970000105084070, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, c/o US Attorney, receipt #70161970000105084087, and United States Department of Veterans Affairs VBA Central Office, receipt #70161970000105084254 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70161970000105084070. (Y,A) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs c/o U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (T,Je) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Stewart D Roll. (Attachments: #1 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons for U.S. Attorney N.D. Ohio)(Simpkins, Scott) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Remark by Clerk re Service Upon U.S. Government Defendant. If a U.S. Government agency or officer is sued, you must provide summons for that defendant, for the U.S. Attorney General (Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. 20530) and the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio (801 West Superior Avenue, Suite 400, Cleveland, OH 44113-1852). (T,Je) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (T,Je) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (T,Je) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint against United States Department of Veterans Affairs. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9662232.. Filed by Stewart D Roll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FOIA request, #2 Exhibit B - USDVA acknowledgment of receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Simpkins, Scott) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.