This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:29:42 (UTC).

Rolfes v. Arbiter Sports, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 Rolfes filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Arbiter Sports, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Black. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01028

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Rolfes

Defendant

Arbiter Sports, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Terence Richard Coates

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Dylan James Gould

Attorney at Markovits Stock & DeMarco

3825 Edwards Rd., Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Zachary C Schaengold

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Wilbert Benjamin Markovits

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco LLC

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Defendant Attorney

Carrie Dettmer Slye

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

312 Walnut Street, Suite 3200

Cincinnati, OH 45202-4074

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Michael Rolfes (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 4/14/2021. by Defendant Arbiter Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dettmer Slye, Carrie) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 3/15/2021. by Defendant Arbiter Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dettmer Slye, Carrie) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Dettmer Slye for Defendant Arbiter Sports, LLC (Dettmer Slye, Carrie) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Arbiter Blog Post

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Arbiter Sports, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7903419), filed by Michael Rolfes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbiter Blog Post, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (rrs) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Michael Rolfes (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotation Order: This civil action is before the Court on the parties' joint motion to extend the deadline by which Defendant is required to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. (Doc. #5 ). For good cause shown, that motion (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 5/14/2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/14/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 5/14/2021. by Defendant Arbiter Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dettmer Slye, Carrie) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotation Order: This civil action is before the Court on Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Doc. #4 ). For good cause shown, that motion (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) on or before 4/14/2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/12/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 4/14/2021. by Defendant Arbiter Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dettmer Slye, Carrie) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotation Order: This civil action is before the Court on Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Doc. #3 ). For good cause shown, that motion (Doc. #3 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) on or before 3/15/2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/28/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 3/15/2021. by Defendant Arbiter Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dettmer Slye, Carrie) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Dettmer Slye for Defendant Arbiter Sports, LLC (Dettmer Slye, Carrie) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Arbiter Sports, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7903419), filed by Michael Rolfes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbiter Blog Post, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie Dettmer Slye