This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 10:54:23 (UTC).

Rolfe et al v. Obaisi et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Rolfe filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Obaisi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02611

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tony A. Rolfe

Defendants

L. Williams

Andrea Rigsby

Colleen M. Franklin

Randy Pfister

Walter Nicholson

Saleh Obaisi

Ghaliah Obaisi, Independent Exectutor of the Estate of Saleh Obaisi, M.D., deceased

Wexford Health Sources, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Francis Policastro

123 North Wacker Drive, Ste 1800

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Colleen Marie Shannon

Attorney at Office of the Illinois Attorney General

100 West Randolph Street, 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION by Plaintiff Tony A. Rolfe requesting a copy of your Honor's Order appointing counsel (bg, ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Walter Nicholson, Randy Pfister by Colleen Marie Shannon (Shannon, Colleen) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Tony A. Rolfe. Ghaliah Obaisi, Independent Exectutor of the Estate of Saleh Obaisi, M.D., deceased waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#9

(#9) First AMENDED complaint by Tony A. Rolfe against Walter Nicholson, Saleh Obaisi, Randy Pfister, Service List, L. Williams, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Ghaliah Obaisi, Independent Exectutor of the Estate of Saleh Obaisi, M.D., deceased and terminating Colleen M. Franklin ((Counselor)) and Andrea Rigsby (Counselor/Grievance Officer) (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to #7 is granted. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION by Plaintiff Tony A. Rolfe for extension of time to amend Complaint (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tony A. Rolfe by Matthew Francis Policastro (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court authorizes and orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $20.91 from Plaintiffs account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee, and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this order to the trust account office at Plaintiff's place of confinement. However, summonses shall not issue at this time. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is granted. The Court requests that Matthew Francis Policastro / Kanaris, Stubenvoll & Heiss, P.C. / One South Wacker Drive, Suite 3100 / Chicago, Illinois 60606 / (312) 474-1400 mpolicastro@kshlaw.com represent Plaintiff in accordance with counsel's trial bar commitment under Local Rule 83.37 (N.D. Ill.). The Court encourages counsel to visit the Northern District's Pro Bono web page at http://www.ilnd.usCourts.gov/Pages.aspx?page=ProBono (case sensitive) for various resources related to pro bono representation. The complaint on file is dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff's counsel filing an amended complaint by 5/13/2019, assuming counsel can do so consistent with his obligations under Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The recruited attorney falls within the class of users listed in the Electronic Public Access fee schedule adopted by the Judicial Conference of the United States. Therefore, the above named attorney shall be exempt from the payment of fees for access via PACER to the electronic case files maintained in this Court for the above-captioned case. The recruited attorney is directed to open a separate PACER account to only be used for this case, and fees are exempt for this case only. The assigned attorney shall not be exempt from the payment of fees incurred in connection with other uses of the PACER system in this Court. This exemption is valid immediately and for the duration of the attorney's participation in the matter. This exemption may be revoked at the discretion of the Court at any time. The attorney shall contact the PACER Service Center at 1-800-676 6856 or via the link below to create the new PACER account and to make any necessary arrangements for the waiver. A copy of this order shall be sent to the PACER Service Center at http://www. pacer.psc.usCourts.gov/register.html. A copy of this order shall also be sent to the Systems Department of the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 4/22/2019. Mailed notice (cc, ) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Tony A. Rolfe for attorney representation. (smm, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Tony A. Rolfe for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (Attahment). (smm, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Tony A. Rolfe; Jury Demand; (Exhibits). (smm, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION by Plaintiff Tony A. Rolfe requesting a copy of your Honor's Order appointing counsel (bg, ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Walter Nicholson, Randy Pfister by Colleen Marie Shannon (Shannon, Colleen) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Tony A. Rolfe. Ghaliah Obaisi, Independent Exectutor of the Estate of Saleh Obaisi, M.D., deceased waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First AMENDED complaint by Tony A. Rolfe against Walter Nicholson, Saleh Obaisi, Randy Pfister, Service List, L. Williams, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Ghaliah Obaisi, Independent Exectutor of the Estate of Saleh Obaisi, M.D., deceased and terminating Colleen M. Franklin ((Counselor)) and Andrea Rigsby (Counselor/Grievance Officer) (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to #7 is granted. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Plaintiff Tony A. Rolfe for extension of time to amend Complaint (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tony A. Rolfe by Matthew Francis Policastro (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILED a copy of order #5 to the trust account office at Statevill Correctional Center. Forwarded a copy of order #5 to the Systems Department at the Northern District of Illinois. (cc, ) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court authorizes and orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $20.91 from Plaintiffs account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee, and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this order to the trust account office at Plaintiff's place of confinement. However, summonses shall not issue at this time. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is granted. The Court requests that Matthew Francis Policastro / Kanaris, Stubenvoll & Heiss, P.C. / One South Wacker Drive, Suite 3100 / Chicago, Illinois 60606 / (312) 474-1400 mpolicastro@kshlaw.com represent Plaintiff in accordance with counsel's trial bar commitment under Local Rule 83.37 (N.D. Ill.). The Court encourages counsel to visit the Northern District's Pro Bono web page at http://www.ilnd.usCourts.gov/Pages.aspx?page=ProBono (case sensitive) for various resources related to pro bono representation. The complaint on file is dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff's counsel filing an amended complaint by 5/13/2019, assuming counsel can do so consistent with his obligations under Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The recruited attorney falls within the class of users listed in the Electronic Public Access fee schedule adopted by the Judicial Conference of the United States. Therefore, the above named attorney shall be exempt from the payment of fees for access via PACER to the electronic case files maintained in this Court for the above-captioned case. The recruited attorney is directed to open a separate PACER account to only be used for this case, and fees are exempt for this case only. The assigned attorney shall not be exempt from the payment of fees incurred in connection with other uses of the PACER system in this Court. This exemption is valid immediately and for the duration of the attorney's participation in the matter. This exemption may be revoked at the discretion of the Court at any time. The attorney shall contact the PACER Service Center at 1-800-676 6856 or via the link below to create the new PACER account and to make any necessary arrangements for the waiver. A copy of this order shall be sent to the PACER Service Center at http://www. pacer.psc.usCourts.gov/register.html. A copy of this order shall also be sent to the Systems Department of the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 4/22/2019. Mailed notice (cc, ) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Tony A. Rolfe for attorney representation. (smm, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Tony A. Rolfe for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (Attahment). (smm, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Tony A. Rolfe; Jury Demand; (Exhibits). (smm, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew F. Policastro