This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2020 at 09:51:34 (UTC).

Roletter v. University of Arizona et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 Roletter filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against University of Arizona. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Soto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00152

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James A Soto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hayden C Roletter

Defendants

Alexander M Merrywell

Ali Tavakoly

Scott L Slepian

Connor J Semenko

Brock R Neuhaus

Matthew J Palmieri

George P Lymberis

Bryce C Piro

Blake M Brenton

Tyler J Austin

Gabriel V Lombard

Arizona Board of Regents

University of Arizona

Theta Chi Fraternity Incorporated

Luke R Rusnak

Gregory G LaSalle

Jacob G LaSalle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert W Thompson

Attorney at Callahan Thompson Sherman & Caudill LLP

2601 Main St., Ste. 800

Irvine, CA 92614

Alex Andrea Zolg

Attorney at Callahan Thompson Sherman & Caudill LLP

2601 Main St., Ste. 800

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorneys

William Fleming King

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC - Phoenix, AZ

2325 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Robert Richard McCright

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Tucson - Liability Mgmt.

177 N Church St., Ste. 1105

Tucson, AZ 85701

Philip J Downs, Jr.

Attorney at Cokinos Young

1 Embarcadero Ctr., Ste. 390

San Francisco, CA 94111

JC Patrascioiu

Attorney at Curl Glasson & Patrascioiu PLC

485 S Main Ave., Bldg. 1

Tucson, AZ 85701-2227

Michael Claude Osborne

Attorney at Cokinos Young

1 Embarcadero Ctr., Ste. 390

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jaskiran Kaur Samra

Attorney at Cokinos Young

1 Embarcadero Ctr., Ste. 390

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#21

8 #16

Summons Summons in Civil Action to Newhaus

8 #14

Summons Summons in Civil Action to Arizona Board of Regents

8 #3

Summons Summons in Civil Action to Ali Tavakoly

8 #2

Summons Summon in Civil Action to Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc.

8 #1

Summons Summons in Civil Action to The University of Arizona

#8

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Hayden C Roletter.(Zolg, Alex) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Hayden C Roletter Notice of Filing First Amended Complaint. (Zolg, Alex) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER Upon stipulation of counsel for Plaintiff Hayden C. Roletter and Defendant Arizona Board of Regents/University of Arizona, and good cause appearing, it is hereby ORDERED that the time for Defendant Arizona Board of Regents/University of Arizona to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be and hereby is extended to and including June 26, 2020. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 5/29/2020. (DLC) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER Defendant Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc. shall have up to and including July 2, 2020 to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #1 ). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 5/29/2020. (DLC) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Blake M Brenton, Gregory G LaSalle, Gabriel V Lombard, George P Lymberis, Alexander M Merrywell, Brock R Neuhaus, Bryce C Piro, Luke R Rusnak, Connor J Semenko, Scott L Slepian, Ali Tavakoly: Acceptance of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Court's April 15, 2020 Order upon Blake M. Brenton, Jacob G. LaSalle (incorrectly named Gregory G. LaSalle), Gabriel V. Lombard, George P. Lymberis, Alexander M. Merrywell, Brock R. Neuhaus, Bryce C. Piro, Luke R. Rusnak, Connor J. Semenko, Scott L. Slepian, and Ali Tavakoly on 05/29/2020. (King, William) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alex Andrea Zolg on behalf of Plaintiff Hayden C Roletter. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Arizona Board of Regents, University of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCright, Robert) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Richard McCright on behalf of Arizona Board of Regents, University of Arizona. (McCright, Robert) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) *Service executed by Hayden C Roletter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Thompson, Robert) *Modified to correct event type on 5/27/2020 (BAC). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (Joint) by Theta Chi Fraternity Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Samra, Jaskiran) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Hayden C Roletter. (Thompson, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *SUMMONS Submitted by Hayden C Roletter. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons in Civil Action to The University of Arizona, #2 Summons Summon in Civil Action to Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc., #3 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Ali Tavakoly, #4 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Connor J. Semenko, #5 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Scott L. Slepian, #6 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Luke R. Rusnak, #7 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Bryce C. Piro, #8 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Matthew J. Palmieri, #9 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Alexander M. Merrywell, #10 Summons Summons in Civil Action to George P. Lymberis, #11 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Gabriel V. Lombard, #12 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Jacob G. LaSalle, #13 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Blake M. Brenton, #14 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Arizona Board of Regents, #15 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Tyler Austin, #16 Summons Summons in Civil Action to Newhaus)(Thompson, Robert) *Modified on 4/13/2020 to reflect main document is civil cover sheet, correctly filed at doc. #9 . (DLC). (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Robert W Thompson on behalf of Plaintiff Hayden C Roletter. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Hayden C Roletter. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Hayden C Roletter. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file correct document- use event "Additional Attachments to main document". Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Hayden C Roletter. Only one defendant per summons. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18168489. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-152-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Hayden C Roletter. (Thompson, Robert) (DLC) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18168489 filed by Hayden C Roletter. (Thompson, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University of Arizona is a litigant

Latest cases where Arizona Board of Regents is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Walter Thompson