This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2023 at 08:43:54 (UTC).

Roland v. First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Roland filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against First-Citizens Bank Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ann L. Aiken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00011

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann L. Aiken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lawrence W. Roland

Portland, OR 97205

Defendants

LoanCare, LLC

First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company

CIT Bank Inc.

MTC Financial, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Trustee Corps

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Britta E. Warren

Attorney at Black Helterline, LLP

805 Sw Broadway, Suite 1900

Portland, OR 97205-3359

Defendant Attorney

Nathan F. Smith

Attorney at Malcolm Cisneros

2112 Business Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 22CV42964 from Oregon Circuit Court, County of Marion. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8772698 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by LoanCare, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Smith, Nathan) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by LoanCare, LLC. (Smith, Nathan) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 1/4/2023 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#4

(#4) Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 to Plaintiff Filed by LoanCare, LLC. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Smith, Nathan) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#5

(#5) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/4/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/5/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 6/5/2023. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/4/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/5/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 6/5/2023. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 to Plaintiff Filed by LoanCare, LLC. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Smith, Nathan) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 1/4/2023 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by LoanCare, LLC. (Smith, Nathan) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 22CV42964 from Oregon Circuit Court, County of Marion. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8772698 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by LoanCare, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Smith, Nathan) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less