This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2019 at 07:37:27 (UTC).

Roland et al v. Alta Mesa Resources, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Roland filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alta Mesa Resources, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald E. Bush. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00212

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald E. Bush

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel Roland

Randall Kauffman

Marcia Roland

Richard Peterson

Thana Kauffman

Brett Moore

Thomas G Roland

Semon Terri

Kathleen Moore

Gregory Semon

Terri Semon

Marcia R Roland

Kathleen A Moore

Defendants

High Mesa Services, LLC

Alta Mesa Resources, Inc.

Alta Mesa Services, LP

AM Idaho, LLC

Alta Mesa Holdings, LP

High Mesa Holdings, LP

Northwest Gas Processing LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vaughn Fisher

Attorney at Fisher Rainey Hudson

950 W. Bannock St., Ste. 630

Boise, ID 83702

Jeremiah Matthew Hudson

Attorney at Fisher Rainey Hudson

950 W. Bannock St., Ste. 630

Boise, ID 83702

Rex A. Sharp

Attorney at Rex A. Sharp P.A.

5301 W 75Th Street

Prairie Village, KS 66208

Reagan E. Bradford

Attorney at The Lanier Law Firm, P.C.

431 W. Main Street, Suite D

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Christian

Attorney at Smith + Malek, PLLC

930, 101 S. Capitol Blvd.

Boise, ID 83702

Hannah Andazola

Attorney at Smith + Malek, PLLC

101 S. Capital Blvd., Ste. 930

Boise, ID 83701

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Rex A. Sharp. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1902987.)Vaughn Fisher appearing for Plaintiffs Randall C Kauffman, Thana M Kauffman, Brett L Moore, Kathleen A Moore, Richard Peterson, Daniel Roland, Marcia R Roland, Thomas G Roland, Gregory Semon, Terri Semon. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Fisher, Vaughn)

#5

(#5) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Reagan E. Bradford. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1902973.)Vaughn Fisher appearing for Plaintiffs Randall C Kauffman, Thana M Kauffman, Brett L Moore, Kathleen A Moore, Richard Peterson, Daniel Roland, Marcia R Roland, Thomas G Roland, Gregory Semon, Terri Semon. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Fisher, Vaughn)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by AM Idaho, LLC, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC.(Christian, Michael)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AM Idaho, LLC, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent High Mesa Holdings, LP for AM Idaho, LLC, High Mesa Services, LLC; Corporate Parent Alta Mesa Holdings, LP for Alta Mesa Services, LP; Corporate Parent Alta Mesa Resources, Inc. for Alta Mesa Holdings, LP.. (Christian, Michael)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for AM Idaho, LLC, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC, Randall C Kauffman, Thana M Kauffman, Brett L Moore, Kathleen A Moore, Northwest Gas Processing LLC, Richard Peterson, Daniel Roland, Marcia R Roland, Thomas G Roland, Gregory Semon, Terri Semon re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/12/2019. (jd)

1 #12

Exhibit Exhibit K- Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #11

Exhibit Exhibit J- Summons to Northwest Gas Processing, LLC

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit I- Summons to High Mesa Services, LLC

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit H-Summons to High Mesa Holdings, LP

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit G-Summons to AM IDAHO LLC

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit F- Summons to Alta Mesa Holdings, LP

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit E- Summons to Alta Mesa Services, LP

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D- Summons to Alta Mesa Resources, Inc.

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C- Acknowledgment of Service

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B- Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A- State Court Docket

1 #1

Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, AM Idaho LLC, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC, and Northwest Gas Processing LLC. (Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1899579.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit B- Complaint, #4 Exhibit C- Acknowledgment of Service, #5 Exhibit D- Summons to Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., #6 Exhibit E- Summons to Alta Mesa Services, LP, #7 Exhibit F- Summons to Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, #8 Exhibit G-Summons to AM IDAHO LLC, #9 Exhibit H-Summons to High Mesa Holdings, LP, #10 Exhibit I- Summons to High Mesa Services, LLC, #11 Exhibit J- Summons to Northwest Gas Processing, LLC, #12 Exhibit K- Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Christian, Michael) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jd).

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • (#8) Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Rex A. Sharp and Reagan E. Bradford #5 for Randall C Kauffman, Thana M Kauffman, Brett L Moore, Kathleen A Moore, Richard Peterson, Daniel Roland, Marcia R Roland, Thomas G Roland,Gregory Semon, Terri Semon Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk);(Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) Modified on 6/21/2019 (jd).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Rex A. Sharp. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1902987.)Vaughn Fisher appearing for Plaintiffs Randall C Kauffman, Thana M Kauffman, Brett L Moore, Kathleen A Moore, Richard Peterson, Daniel Roland, Marcia R Roland, Thomas G Roland, Gregory Semon, Terri Semon. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Fisher, Vaughn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Reagan E. Bradford. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1902973.)Vaughn Fisher appearing for Plaintiffs Randall C Kauffman, Thana M Kauffman, Brett L Moore, Kathleen A Moore, Richard Peterson, Daniel Roland, Marcia R Roland, Thomas G Roland, Gregory Semon, Terri Semon. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Fisher, Vaughn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by AM Idaho, LLC, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC.(Christian, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AM Idaho, LLC, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent High Mesa Holdings, LP for AM Idaho, LLC, High Mesa Services, LLC; Corporate Parent Alta Mesa Holdings, LP for Alta Mesa Services, LP; Corporate Parent Alta Mesa Resources, Inc. for Alta Mesa Holdings, LP.. (Christian, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for AM Idaho, LLC, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC, Randall C Kauffman, Thana M Kauffman, Brett L Moore, Kathleen A Moore, Northwest Gas Processing LLC, Richard Peterson, Daniel Roland, Marcia R Roland, Thomas G Roland, Gregory Semon, Terri Semon re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/12/2019. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - All Defendants. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., Alta Mesa Services, LP, Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, AM Idaho LLC, High Mesa Holdings, LP, High Mesa Services, LLC, and Northwest Gas Processing LLC. (Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1899579.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit B- Complaint, #4 Exhibit C- Acknowledgment of Service, #5 Exhibit D- Summons to Alta Mesa Resources, Inc., #6 Exhibit E- Summons to Alta Mesa Services, LP, #7 Exhibit F- Summons to Alta Mesa Holdings, LP, #8 Exhibit G-Summons to AM IDAHO LLC, #9 Exhibit H-Summons to High Mesa Holdings, LP, #10 Exhibit I- Summons to High Mesa Services, LLC, #11 Exhibit J- Summons to Northwest Gas Processing, LLC, #12 Exhibit K- Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Christian, Michael) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jd).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.