This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2020 at 10:34:20 (UTC).

Rohr et al v. City of Detroit et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Rohr filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Detroit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David R. Grand and Laurie J. Michelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11697

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

Presiding Judge

Laurie J. Michelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Baylee Huffman

Nadia Rohr

Defendants

Detroit Police Department

City of Detroit

John Doe Police Officers

John Doe Police Officer 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Solomon M. Radner

Attorney at EXCOLO LAW, PLLC

26700 Lahser Rd, Suite 401

Southfield, MI 48033

Madeline M. Sinkovich

Attorney at Excolo Law, PLLC

26700 Lahser Rd., Ste 401

Southfield, MI 48033

Defendant Attorney

Calvert A. Bailey

Attorney at Detroit City Law Department

1650 First National Building

Detroit, MI 48226

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Madeline M. Sinkovich appearing on behalf of Baylee Huffman, Nadia Rohr (Sinkovich, Madeline) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by City of Detroit. (Bailey, Calvert) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of Answer filed by Baylee Huffman, Nadia Rohr. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Detroit Police Department (CORRECTED) served on 7/10/20. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. City of Detroit served on 7/13/20. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Detroit Police Department served on 7/1/2020. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER Regarding Determination of #4 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of Answer filed by Detroit Police Department. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of Answer by Detroit Police Department. (Bailey, Calvert) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Detroit Police Department* (SKra) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *City of Detroit* (SKra) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7887160 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Madeline M. Sinkovich appearing on behalf of Baylee Huffman, Nadia Rohr (Sinkovich, Madeline) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by City of Detroit. (Bailey, Calvert) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of Answer filed by Baylee Huffman, Nadia Rohr. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Detroit Police Department (CORRECTED) served on 7/10/20. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. City of Detroit served on 7/13/20. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Detroit Police Department served on 7/1/2020. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Regarding Determination of #4 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of Answer filed by Detroit Police Department. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of Answer by Detroit Police Department. (Bailey, Calvert) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Detroit Police Department* (SKra) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *City of Detroit* (SKra) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7887160 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Detroit Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madeline M. Sinkovich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Solomon Mordechai Radner