This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2020 at 07:15:21 (UTC).

Rohde v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Rohde filed an Other lawsuit against Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06355

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Rohde

Defendant

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John P Carlin

Attorney at Suburban Legal Group

1305 Remington Road, Suite C

Schaumburg, IL 60173

Defendant Attorney

Raseq Moizuddin

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal #5 , the terms of which are set forth therein. The status hearing set for 1/6/2021 #3 is stricken. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Rohde (Carlin, John) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC by Raseq Moizuddin (Moizuddin, Raseq) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 1/6/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 12/29/2020. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 1/6/2021 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Rohde by John P Carlin (Carlin, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Michael Rohde; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17582689. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Carlin, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal #5 , the terms of which are set forth therein. The status hearing set for 1/6/2021 #3 is stricken. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Rohde (Carlin, John) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC by Raseq Moizuddin (Moizuddin, Raseq) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 1/6/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 12/29/2020. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 1/6/2021 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (jg, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Rohde by John P Carlin (Carlin, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Michael Rohde; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17582689. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Carlin, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less