This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:49 (UTC).

Rohde v. ADP, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Rohde filed an Other lawsuit against ADP, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03347

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth Rohde

Defendant

ADP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eugene Y. Turin

Attorney at Mcguire Law, P.C.

55 W. Wacker Dr., 9Th Fl.

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Emma O'connor

Attorney at Jenner & Block Llp

353 N Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

David Charles Layden

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Motion by David Charles Layden for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/9/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Layden, David) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Defendant ADP, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Agreed) (Layden, David) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ADP, LLC by Emma O'connor (O'connor, Emma) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ADP, LLC by David Charles Layden (Layden, David) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #6 is granted. Defendants' responsive pleading is due by 7/25/19. The Court strikes the initial status hearing set for 7/16/19 and resets it to 8/1/19 at 1:30 p.m., with the initial status report due by 7/26/19. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Elizabeth Rohde; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15839483. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Turin, Eugene) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 7/16/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 7/9/2019. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #6 is granted. Defendants' responsive pleading is due by 7/25/19. The Court strikes the initial status hearing set for 7/16/19 and resets it to 8/1/19 at 1:30 p.m., with the initial status report due by 7/26/19. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Motion by David Charles Layden for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/9/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Layden, David) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Defendant ADP, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Agreed) (Layden, David) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ADP, LLC by Emma O'connor (O'connor, Emma) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ADP, LLC by David Charles Layden (Layden, David) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 7/16/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 7/9/2019. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ADP, LLC. (ew, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Elizabeth Rohde; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15839483. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Turin, Eugene) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.