This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2019 at 07:19:51 (UTC).

Rogers v. State Automobile Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 Rogers filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against State Automobile Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine A. Robertson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-30103

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine A. Robertson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rickey Rogers

Springfield, MA 01119

Defendant

State Automobile Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Deborah Etlinger

Attorney at Wolf Horowitz & Etlinger, LLC

99 Pratt Street, Suite 401

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Automobile Corporation identifying Corporate Parent State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company for State Automobile Corporation.. (Etlinger, Deborah) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State Automobile Corporation d/b/a State Auto Insurance Companies, filed by Rickey Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet) (Rivera, Christina) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#4

(#4) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (Rivera, Christina) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered granting the Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; cc/Plaintiff. (Finn, Mary) Modified to add order on 8/14/19 (Lindsay, Maurice). (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Etlinger on behalf of State Automobile Corporation (Etlinger, Deborah) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed State Automobile Corporation served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet

#13

(#13) First MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/10/2019 to file a responsive pleading/answer to the Complaint by State Automobile Corporation.(Etlinger, Deborah) Modified on 9/12/2019 to change the relief type of the motion to MOTION for Extension of Tiem to File and Answer. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to State Automobile Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service.; cc/Plaintiff. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • (#15) Copy re 14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer mailed to Rickey Rogers, 47 Gatewood Road, Springfield, MA 01119 on 9/12/2019. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting the Defendant's #13 Request for an Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint. State Automobile Corporation's Response is due by no later than 10/10/2019; cc/Pltf. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 9/12/2019 to correct relief sought. (Rivera, Melissa) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) First MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/10/2019 to file a responsive pleading/answer to the Complaint by State Automobile Corporation.(Etlinger, Deborah) Modified on 9/12/2019 to change the relief type of the motion to MOTION for Extension of Tiem to File and Answer. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Automobile Corporation identifying Corporate Parent State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company for State Automobile Corporation.. (Etlinger, Deborah) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Etlinger on behalf of State Automobile Corporation (Etlinger, Deborah) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed State Automobile Corporation served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • (#9) Remark: The Plaintiff's completed Summons, the U.S. Marshals Service form and the complaint have been received today and the entire packet have been given to the U.S. Marshals for service on the defendant today. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • (#8) Remark - Blank Summons and Marshals Service Forms forwarded to the Pltf. to be completed and returned so the Marshals may make service. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Copy re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Summons Issued, mailed to Rickey Rogers, 47 Gatewood Road, Springfield, MA 01119 on 7/31/2019. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to State Automobile Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service.; cc/Plaintiff. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered granting the Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; cc/Plaintiff. (Finn, Mary) Modified to add order on 8/14/19 (Lindsay, Maurice). (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (Rivera, Christina) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against State Automobile Corporation d/b/a State Auto Insurance Companies, filed by Rickey Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet) (Rivera, Christina) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.