This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:31:19 (UTC).

Rogers v. Hudnall

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Rogers filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hudnall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly E. West and Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00285

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kimberly E. West

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marc Rogers

Defendant

Kristi Ann Hudnall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Johnson

Attorney at Johnson Hobbs Squires, LLP

400 Austin Ave, Ste 903

Waco, TX 76701

Defendant Attorneys

Bob L. Latham

Attorney at Latham Steele Lehman Keele Ratcliff Freije & Carter, PC

1515 E 71St St, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74136

Brian L. Carter

Attorney at Latham Steele Lehman Keele Ratcliff Freije & Carter, PC

1515 E 71St St, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74136

Steven Oren Kuperman

Attorney at Latham Steele Lehman Keele Ratcliff Freije & Carter, PC

1515 E 71St St, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74136

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) JURY DEMAND by Kristi Ann Hudnall (Carter, Brian) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian L. Carter on behalf of Kristi Ann Hudnall (Carter, Brian) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven Oren Kuperman on behalf of Kristi Ann Hudnall (Kuperman, Steven) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bob L. Latham on behalf of Kristi Ann Hudnall (Latham, Bob) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 8/26/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

2 #9

Exhibit 9 - Discovery

2 #8

Exhibit 8 - Answer to Amended Petition

2 #7

Exhibit 7 - Amended Petition

2 #6

Exhibit 6 - Court Minute

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - Def Answer to Petition

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Motion to Clarify Damage

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Pl Original Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number CJ-2020-098 by Kristi Ann Hudnall (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kristi Ann Hudnall (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 20-285-RAW. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/19/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1393072 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Kristi Ann Hudnall (Carter, Brian) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JURY DEMAND by Kristi Ann Hudnall (Carter, Brian) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian L. Carter on behalf of Kristi Ann Hudnall (Carter, Brian) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven Oren Kuperman on behalf of Kristi Ann Hudnall (Kuperman, Steven) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bob L. Latham on behalf of Kristi Ann Hudnall (Latham, Bob) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 8/26/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number CJ-2020-098 by Kristi Ann Hudnall (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kristi Ann Hudnall (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketANSWER to Amended Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Kristi Ann Hudnall (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Kristi Ann Hudnall by Marc Rogers (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less