This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2020 at 09:17:54 (UTC).

Rogers v. DeKalb County, Georgia

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Rogers filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against DeKalb County, Georgia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04145

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brittany Rogers

Defendant

DeKalb County, Georgia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brittany Ann Barto

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

Suite 1150, 400 Galleria Pkwy

Atlanta, GA 30339

Gordon Van Remmen

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

Suite 1150, 400 Galleria Pkwy

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant Attorney

Laura Lewis Moore

Attorney at DeKalb County Law Department

5Th Floor, 1300 Commerce Dr.

Decatur, GA 30030

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Brittany Rogers.(Barto, Brittany) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#8

(#8) Initial Disclosures by DeKalb County, Georgia.(Moore, Laura) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#7

(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Brittany Rogers. (Barto, Brittany) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by DeKalb County, Georgia. Discovery ends on 4/2/2021.(Moore, Laura) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by Brittany Rogers. DeKalb County, Georgia served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Van Remmen, Gordon) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/9/20. (bnw) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#3

(#3) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to DeKalb County, Georgia. (eop) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brittany Rogers. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10236738) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Brittany Rogers.(Barto, Brittany) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Disclosures by DeKalb County, Georgia.(Moore, Laura) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Brittany Rogers. (Barto, Brittany) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by DeKalb County, Georgia. Discovery ends on 4/2/2021.(Moore, Laura) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by Brittany Rogers. DeKalb County, Georgia served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Van Remmen, Gordon) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/9/20. (bnw) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to DeKalb County, Georgia. (eop) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brittany Rogers. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10236738) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DeKalb County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany Ann Barto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gordon Van Remmen