Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2019 at 08:22:49 (UTC).

Rogers v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Rogers filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and P. Bradley Murray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00903

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

Referral Judge

P. Bradley Murray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melissa E Rogers

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott R Seideman

Attorney at Seideman Law Firm PC

701 Commerce St., Ste. 400

Dallas, TX 75202

Nathan Craig VanDerVeer

Attorney at Goldasich Vick & Fulk

2100 3Rd Avenue North, Suite 400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

201 17Th Street Nw 17Th Floor

Atlanta, GA 30363

Taylor Tapley Daly

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Diane Babb Maughan

Attorney at Cabaniss, Johnston, Gardner, Dumas & O'Neal

P.O. Box 830612

Birmingham, AL 35283-0612

George LaFayette Morris

2001 Park Place North, Suite 700

Birmingham, AL 35203

Brandee J. Kowalzyk

Attorney at Nelson Mullins

201 17Th Street Ne, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Supplement Certificates of Good Standing

#17

(#17) MOTION and APPLICATION for Scott Seideman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. of Scott R. Seideman Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2524027, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Melissa E Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificates of Good Standing) (VanDerVeer, Nathan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Craig VanDerVeer on behalf of Melissa E Rogers (VanDerVeer, Nathan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2516677, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Kowalzyk, Brandee) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2515793, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Daly, Taylor) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#10

No Description Available

#7

(#9) Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Defendants C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by George LaFayette Morris on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Babb Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03243. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#3

(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/31/2019.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16930291 filed by Melissa E Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/31/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Scott R. Seideman. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/6/19. (lto) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION and APPLICATION for Scott Seideman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. of Scott R. Seideman.Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION and APPLICATION for Scott Seideman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. of Scott R. Seideman Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2524027, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Melissa E Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificates of Good Standing) (VanDerVeer, Nathan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Craig VanDerVeer on behalf of Melissa E Rogers (VanDerVeer, Nathan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Brandee J. Kowalzyk. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/21/19. (lto) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2516677, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Kowalzyk, Brandee) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Taylor T. Daly. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/20/19. (lto) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2515793, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Daly, Taylor) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Defendants C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Morris, George) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by George LaFayette Morris on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Babb Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03243. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/31/2019.] (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/31/2019.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-3243-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/31/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16930291 filed by Melissa E Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/31/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan C VanDerVeer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott R Seideman