This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2020 at 08:43:09 (UTC).

Rogers v. Bellerose

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Rogers filed an Other lawsuit against Bellerose. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00438

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William E Rogers

Defendant

Nancy Bellerose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Alan Neal Smith

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

2 Embarcadero Center, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Renotice motion hearing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byNancy Bellerose. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Ferber, Michelle) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

20 #3

Exhibit B

20 #2

Exhibit A

20 #1

Declaration Connor M. Day

#20

(#20) REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byNancy Bellerose. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Connor M. Day, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ferber, Michelle) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byWilliam E Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, James) (Filed on 2/28/2020) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

17 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#17

(#17) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/27/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M Shabbar (Shabbar, Sean) (Filed on 2/6/2020) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by William E Rogers identifying Corporate Parent American Fire Wire Inc. for William E Rogers. (Smith, James) (Filed on 2/5/2020) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William E Rogers.. (Smith, James) (Filed on 2/5/2020) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William E Rogers re #1 Complaint Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint (Smith, James) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Nancy Bellerose. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Smith, James) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William E Rogers re #1 Complaint Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint (Smith, James) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Hearing as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Renotice motion hearing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byNancy Bellerose. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Ferber, Michelle) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byNancy Bellerose. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Connor M. Day, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ferber, Michelle) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byWilliam E Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, James) (Filed on 2/28/2020) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#18) REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Chhabria's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/27/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nancy Bellerose.. (Babione, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/25/2020) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/26/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle R. Ferber for Connor M. Day (Ferber, Michelle) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Nancy Bellerose. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 2/28/2020. Replies due by 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ferber, Michelle) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M Shabbar (Shabbar, Sean) (Filed on 2/6/2020) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by William E Rogers identifying Corporate Parent American Fire Wire Inc. for William E Rogers. (Smith, James) (Filed on 2/5/2020) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William E Rogers.. (Smith, James) (Filed on 2/5/2020) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William E Rogers re #1 Complaint Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint (Smith, James) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Nancy Bellerose. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Smith, James) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nancy Bellerose ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14090892.). Filed byWilliam E Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, James) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less