This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2022 at 09:20:01 (UTC).

Rogers v. Bayer U.S. LLC

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 Rogers filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bayer U S LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly L. Teeter and Gwynne E. Birzer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01044

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly L. Teeter

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kay Rogers

Defendant

BAYER U.S. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Jon Omlid

Attorney at DeVaughn James Injury Lawyers

3241 North Toben Street

Wichita, KS 67226

Dustin L. DeVaughn

Attorney at DeVaughn James Injury Lawyers

3241 North Toben Street

Wichita, KS 67226

Defendant Attorney

Scott E. Sanders

Attorney at McDonald Tinker, PA

300 West Douglas Avenue, Suite 500, Po Box 207

Wichita, KS 67202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5711846.), filed by Kay Rogers. (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kay Rogers. (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#3

(#3) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/21/2022 for Defendant Bayer U.S. LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/18/2022. (jk) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kay Rogers upon Bayer U.S. LLC served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/21/2022 (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Bayer U.S. LLC. (Sanders, Scott) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#6

(#6) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Bayer U.S. LLC. (Sanders, Scott) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#7

(#7) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Bayer U.S. LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Sanders, Scott) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2022 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 5/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/23/22. (ala) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2022 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 5/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/23/22. (ala) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Bayer U.S. LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Sanders, Scott) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Bayer U.S. LLC. (Sanders, Scott) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Bayer U.S. LLC. (Sanders, Scott) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kay Rogers upon Bayer U.S. LLC served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/21/2022 (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/21/2022 for Defendant Bayer U.S. LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/18/2022. (jk) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer U.S. LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kay Rogers. (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5711846.), filed by Kay Rogers. (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYER U.S. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E. Sanders