This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:04:04 (UTC).

ROGERS v. A. O. SMITH CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 ROGERS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05666

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY

FOSTER WHEELER, LLC

TEXTRON

FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC

A. O. SMITH CORP.

GOODYEAR CANADA

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL

LENNOX INDUSTRIES

AURORA PUMP

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

COCHRANE, INC.

CRANE CO.

CLARK CONTROLLER CO.

WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA

SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY

BW/IP INC.

GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO.

LYCOMING

CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION

GREENE TWEED & CO., INC.

88 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 610

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ERIC J. KADISH

Attorney at MARON, MARVEL, BRADLEY & ANDERSON P.A.

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch St Ste 3710

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOHN P. MCSHEA

Attorney at MCSHEA LAW FIRM PC

1500 Market St Suite 4000

Philadelphia, PA 19102

G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.

Attorney at SWARTZ CAMPBELL, LLC

Two Liberty Place, 50 S. 16Th St., 28Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JOHN A. TURLIK

Attorney at SEGAL MCCAMBRIDGE SINGER & MAHONEY

1818 Market St Ste 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Other Attorneys

JULIO NAVARRO

Attorney at HOAGLAND LONGO MORAN DUNST

701 Wiltsey'S Mill Rd, Bldg B, Suite 202

Hammonton, NJ 08037

ROBERT E. PAUL

Attorney at PAUL REICH & MYERS, PC

1608 Walnut St., Ste 500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

GREGORY M. STOKES

Attorney at SWARTZ CAMPBELL LLC

Two Liberty Pl 28Th Fl, 50 South 16Th St

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by A. O. SMITH CORP..(KADISH, ERIC) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of A. O. SMITH CORP. with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER THAT C.A. NOS 19-5544 AND 19-5666 SHALL BE CONSOLIDTED UNDER 19-5544 FOR ALL PURPOSES. C.A. NO. 16-5666 SHALL BE STATISTICALLY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT CBS CORP'S MOTION TO DISMISS IN C.A. NO. 19-5666 IS GRANTED AND THE COMPLAINTS IN BOTH ACTIONS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN C.A. NO. 19-5544 NO LATER THAN 1/10/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/11/19. 12/12/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#20

(#20) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#19

(#19) ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ALLEN-BRADLEY CO.S ANSWER to Complaint AND JURY DEMAND; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; CROSS-CLAIMS; AND ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#17

(#17) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#16

(#16) Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE CO. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY on behalf of AVCO, TEXTRON with Certificate of Service(BAILEY, MEGAN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP INC. (TURLIK, JOHN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CBS CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent NATIONAL AMUSEMENTS, INC., Corporate Parent GAMCO INVESTORS, INC. for CBS CORPORATION, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT CBS CORPORATION.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheets

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County, PA, Certificate of Service, case number 191003127. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE207595) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#24) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (mbh, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by A. O. SMITH CORP..(KADISH, ERIC) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of A. O. SMITH CORP. with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER THAT C.A. NOS 19-5544 AND 19-5666 SHALL BE CONSOLIDTED UNDER 19-5544 FOR ALL PURPOSES. C.A. NO. 16-5666 SHALL BE STATISTICALLY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT CBS CORP'S MOTION TO DISMISS IN C.A. NO. 19-5666 IS GRANTED AND THE COMPLAINTS IN BOTH ACTIONS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN C.A. NO. 19-5544 NO LATER THAN 1/10/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/11/19. 12/12/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ALLEN-BRADLEY CO.S ANSWER to Complaint AND JURY DEMAND; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; CROSS-CLAIMS; AND ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE CO. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by A. W. CHESTERTON, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Flowserve Corporation by BW/IP INC..(TURLIK, JOHN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of A. W. CHESTERTON, INC. (TURLIK, JOHN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY on behalf of AVCO, TEXTRON with Certificate of Service(BAILEY, MEGAN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP INC. (TURLIK, JOHN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CBS CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent NATIONAL AMUSEMENTS, INC., Corporate Parent GAMCO INVESTORS, INC. for CBS CORPORATION, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT CBS CORPORATION.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DEFTS CBS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (kw, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County, PA, Certificate of Service, case number 191003127. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE207595) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREENE TWEED & CO is a litigant

Latest cases where FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CLERK EQUIPMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant