This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:20:09 (UTC).

Rogers et al v. USAA Savings Bank

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Finance - Consumer Credit case was filed by Rogers against USAA Savings Bank in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Oregon District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01348

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Mark D. Clarke

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christina Rogers

Christopher Rogers

Defendant

USAA Savings Bank

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Krueger for USAA Savings Bank. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6008229 issued. Signed on 9/20/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and transferred to the Medford Division. (plb) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed as to USAA Savings Bank served on 8/26/2019, answer due on 9/16/2019. (Sellers, James) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/23/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/21/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/21/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura E. Kogan . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6007416. Filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Kastan, Joshua) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#13

(#13) Amended Answer to Complaint, #1 . Filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Related document(s): Complaint, #1 .) (Kastan, Joshua) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Kastan, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#14

(#14) Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Christina Rogers, Christopher Rogers. (Sellers, James) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#8

(#8) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David M. Krueger . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 0979-6008229. Filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Kastan, Joshua) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laura E. Kogan for USAA Savings Bank. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6007416 issued. Signed on 9/20/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5975506 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Christina Rogers, Christopher Rogers against USAA Savings Bank (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Sellers, James) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#5

(#5) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Kastan, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

2 #1

Summons Issued

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Christina Rogers, Christopher Rogers. (Sellers, James) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Amended Answer to Complaint, #1 . Filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Related document(s): Complaint, #1 .) (Kastan, Joshua) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • (#12) Notification of CM/ECF Account for David M. Krueger (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: dmkrueger. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Krueger for USAA Savings Bank. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6008229 issued. Signed on 9/20/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • (#10) Notification of CM/ECF Account for Laura E. Kogan (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: lekogan. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laura E. Kogan for USAA Savings Bank. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6007416 issued. Signed on 9/20/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David M. Krueger . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 0979-6008229. Filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Kastan, Joshua) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura E. Kogan . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6007416. Filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Kastan, Joshua) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Kastan, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by USAA Savings Bank. (Kastan, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Return of Service Executed as to USAA Savings Bank served on 8/26/2019, answer due on 9/16/2019. (Sellers, James) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and transferred to the Medford Division. (plb) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/23/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/21/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/21/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5975506 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Christina Rogers, Christopher Rogers against USAA Savings Bank (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Sellers, James) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.