This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2021 at 11:49:36 (UTC).

Rogers et al v. Dignity Health, et al.,

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Rogers filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Dignity Health, . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carolyn K. Delaney and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00566

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephen Rogers

Helen Scully

Nneka Anyanwu

Defendants

Methodist Hospital of Sacramento

Dignity Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zainah Alfi

Attorney at Excelsis Law, P.C.

2801 Hyperion Ave., Studio 104

Los Angeles, CA 90027

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher J. Truxler

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 1600

Sacramento, CA 95814

Harold Ricky Jones, Jr.

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

50 California St., 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4615

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Dignity Health. (Truxler, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Dignity Health, Methodist Hospital of Sacramento re #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Truxler, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#4

(#4) ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Christopher J. Truxler for Dignity Health,Christopher J. Truxler for Methodist Hospital of Sacramento. (Truxler, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

3 #3

VDRP

3 #2

Order re Filing Requirements

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dignity Health (Jones, Harold) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit A

1 #5

Declaration of Joseph Hale

1 #4

Declaration of Harold R. Jones

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00294692 by Dignity Health. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9505466) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Harold R. Jones, #5 Declaration of Joseph Hale, #6 Exhibit A(Jones, Harold) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Dignity Health. (Truxler, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Dignity Health, Methodist Hospital of Sacramento re #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Truxler, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Christopher J. Truxler for Dignity Health,Christopher J. Truxler for Methodist Hospital of Sacramento. (Truxler, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dignity Health (Jones, Harold) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00294692 by Dignity Health. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9505466) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Harold R. Jones, #5 Declaration of Joseph Hale, #6 Exhibit A(Jones, Harold) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Methodist Hospital of Sacramento is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harold Ricky Jones, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J. Truxler