This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2020 at 07:36:48 (UTC).

Roger Leach v. Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 Roger Leach filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roger Leach

Defendant

Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Trinette Gragirena Kent

Attorney at Trinette Kent Law Offices

3219 East Camelback Road No 588

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Defendant Attorney

Paul Tokar

Attorney at Beitchman and Zekian PC

16130 Ventura Boulevard Suite 570

Encino, CA 91436-2581

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, this case remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for final disposition re: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #10 , Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #8 (rn) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#10

(#10) STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group. (Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group answer now due 3/19/2020, filed by Defendant Central Billing, LLC Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group.(Attorney Paul Tokar added to party Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group(pty:dft))(Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#8

(#8) STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#7

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Roger Leach, upon Defendant Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon MK Doe in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group. (lh) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

5 #1

CV-11C

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach, (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25120046 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach. (Attorney Trinette Gragirena Kent added to party Roger Leach(pty:pla))(Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, this case remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for final disposition re: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #10 , Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #8 (rn) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group. (Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group answer now due 3/19/2020, filed by Defendant Central Billing, LLC Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group.(Attorney Paul Tokar added to party Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group(pty:dft))(Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Roger Leach, upon Defendant Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon MK Doe in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Central Billing LLC DBA Pacific Collection Group. (lh) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach, (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25120046 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Roger Leach. (Attorney Trinette Gragirena Kent added to party Roger Leach(pty:pla))(Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL BILLING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Tokar