This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2022 at 20:26:44 (UTC).

Rogan O Handley v. Alex Padilla et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 Rogan O Handley filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Alex Padilla. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-07063

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rogan O Handley

Defendants

Alex Padilla

SKDKNICKERBOCKER, LLC

Paula Valle Castaon

Jenna Dresner

Sam Mahood

Akilah Jones

Shirley N Weber

Twitter Inc.

National Association of Secretaries of State

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harmeet Dhillon

Karin Moore Sweigart

Gregory Richard Michael

Joshua Wallace Dixon

Mark Trammell

Ronald D. Coleman

Defendant Attorneys

Anna Theresa Ferrari

Brian G Svoboda

Stephanie Irene Command

Torryn Marie Taylor

Ari Holtzblatt

David C Marcus

Felicia Ellsworth

Patrick J. Carome

Thomas G. Sprankling

Christine Marie Wheatley

Don Willenburg

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#95

(#95) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/16/2021 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Twitter Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Carome, Patrick) (Filed on 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#94

(#94) Transcript of Videoconference Proceedings held on December 16, 2021, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #91 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2022. (Related documents(s) #91 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#93

(#93) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Bruce V. Spiva. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

92 #1

Proposed Order

92 #92

Main Document

#91

(#91) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/12/2021 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Twitter Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Trevor, Maurice) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#90

(#90) USCA Case Number 22-15071 US Court of appeals for the 9th circuit for #89 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Rogan O Handley. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#89

(#89) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Rogan O Handley. Appeal of Judgment #87 , Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, #86 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number ACANDC-16806721 paid.) (Coleman, Ronald) (Filed on 1/14/2022) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#86

(#86) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #57 SKDK Motion to Dismiss; granting #58 NASS Motion to Dismiss; granting #59 State Motion to Dismiss; granting #60 Twitter Motion to Dismiss; deferring ruling on #61 Motion to Strike. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/16/2021 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Twitter Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Carome, Patrick) (Filed on 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) Transcript of Videoconference Proceedings held on December 16, 2021, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #91 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2022. (Related documents(s) #91 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Bruce V. Spiva. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by SKDKNICKERBOCKER, LLC. Responses due by 2/11/2022. Replies due by 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spiva, Bruce) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/12/2021 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Twitter Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Trevor, Maurice) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) USCA Case Number 22-15071 US Court of appeals for the 9th circuit for #89 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Rogan O Handley. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Rogan O Handley. Appeal of Judgment #87 , Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, #86 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number ACANDC-16806721 paid.) (Coleman, Ronald) (Filed on 1/14/2022) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/16/2021 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Rogan O Handley, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/10/2022. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #57 SKDK Motion to Dismiss; granting #58 NASS Motion to Dismiss; granting #59 State Motion to Dismiss; granting #60 Twitter Motion to Dismiss; deferring ruling on #61 Motion to Strike. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Rogan O Handley. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-04954 CBM(PDx). (rn) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-04954 RSWL(PDx). (rn) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark E. Trammell on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ronald D Coleman on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rogan O'Handley, (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rogan O'Handley. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31487145 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Rogan O'Handley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Attorney Harmeet K. Dhillon added to party Rogan O'Handley(pty:pla))(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less