This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:16:13 (UTC).

Roesinger et al v. Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Roesinger filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01868

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marjorie Roesinger

Stephen J. Roesinger

Defendants

Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.

Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.

Stanley Access Technologies LLC

DH Pace Company, Inc.

DH Pace Company, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Door Control Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Alan Springer

Attorney at Springer & Steinberg, P.C.

1600 Broadway, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202-4920

Matthew M. Holycross

Attorney at Springer & Steinberg, P.C.

1600 Broadway, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202-4920

Phil (Phillip) L. Harding

Attorney at Harding & Associates, P.C.

730 17Th Street, Suite 650

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine M.L. Pratt

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

Saugat K. Thapa

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

Larry S. McClung

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

Kyle Brandon Joyce

Attorney at Montgomery Amatuzio Chase Bell Jones LLP-Denver

4100 E. Mississippi Avenue, Mountain Towers, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80246-3048

Kevin F. Amatuzio

Attorney at Montgomery Amatuzio Chase Bell Jones LLP-Denver

4100 E. Mississippi Avenue, Mountain Towers, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80246-3048

Barbara J. Stauch

Attorney at Waltz/Reeves

1660 Lincoln Street, Suite 2510

Denver, CO 80264

Richard A. Waltz

Attorney at Waltz/Reeves

1660 Lincoln Street, Suite 2510

Denver, CO 80264

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY by Defendant DH Pace Company, Inc.. (Stauch, Barbara) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

24 #5

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

24 #4

Exhibit 4 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extensi

24 #3

Exhibit 3 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extensi

24 #2

Exhibit 2 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extensi

24 #1

Exhibit 1 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extensi

#24

(#24) MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Additional Nonparties at Fault by Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Additional Nonparties at Fault, #2 Exhibit 2 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Additional Nonparties at Fault, #3 Exhibit 3 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Additional Nonparties at Fault, #4 Exhibit 4 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Additional Nonparties at Fault, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Joyce, Kyle) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#23

(#23) DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY by Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC. (Joyce, Kyle) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Springer on behalf of Marjorie Roesinger, Stephen J. RoesingerAttorney Jeffrey Alan Springer added to party Marjorie Roesinger(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Alan Springer added to party Stephen J. Roesinger(pty:pla) (Springer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

1 #12

State Court Summons for Petco Animal Supplies Store

1 #11

State Court Summons for Petco Animal Supplies

1 #10

State Court Summons for DH Pace

1 #9

State Court Delay Reduction Order

1 #8

State Court Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

State Court Complaint

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY by Defendant DH Pace Company, Inc.. (Stauch, Barbara) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Additional Nonparties at Fault by Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Additional Nonparties at Fault, #2 Exhibit 2 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Additional Nonparties at Fault, #3 Exhibit 3 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Additional Nonparties at Fault, #4 Exhibit 4 to Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Additional Nonparties at Fault, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Joyce, Kyle) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY by Defendant Stanley Access Technologies LLC. (Joyce, Kyle) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Springer on behalf of Marjorie Roesinger, Stephen J. RoesingerAttorney Jeffrey Alan Springer added to party Marjorie Roesinger(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Alan Springer added to party Stephen J. Roesinger(pty:pla) (Springer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew M. Holycross on behalf of Marjorie Roesinger, Stephen J. RoesingerAttorney Matthew M. Holycross added to party Marjorie Roesinger(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew M. Holycross added to party Stephen J. Roesinger(pty:pla) (Holycross, Matthew) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard A. Waltz on behalf of DH Pace Company, Inc.Attorney Richard A. Waltz added to party DH Pace Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (Waltz, Richard) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. for Stanley Access Technologies LLC. (Joyce, Kyle) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Phil (Phillip) L. Harding on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harding, Phil (Phillip)) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Phil (Phillip) L. Harding on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Phil (Phillip) L. Harding added to party Marjorie Roesinger(pty:pla), Attorney Phil (Phillip) L. Harding added to party Stephen J. Roesinger(pty:pla) (Harding, Phil (Phillip)) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #15 Order to Jeffrey A. Springer and Matthew M. Holycross at 1600 Broadway, Suite 1200 Denver, Colorado 80202 & Phil Harding and Chris Parrish HARDING & ASSOCIATES, P.C. 730 17th Street, #650 Denver, Colorado 80202. Text Only Entry (tsher, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. (Pratt, Katherine) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry S. McClung on behalf of Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.Attorney Larry S. McClung added to party Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.(pty:dft) (McClung, Larry) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER of Defendant Stanley Access Technologies, LLC to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Jury Demand by Stanley Access Technologies LLC.(rsams, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Petco's Answer, Defenses, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.(rsams, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant D.H. Pace Company, Inc.'s ANSWER and Jury Demand by DH Pace Company, Inc..(rsams, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against DH Pace Company, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Stanley Access Technologies LLC, filed by Marjorie Roesinger, Stephen J. Roesinger.(rsams, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • (#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rsams, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DH Pace Company, Inc. from Denver District Court, Case Number 2019CV32070. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6764921), filed by DH Pace Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 State Court Complaint, #8 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #9 State Court Delay Reduction Order, #10 State Court Summons for DH Pace, #11 State Court Summons for Petco Animal Supplies, #12 State Court Summons for Petco Animal Supplies Store, #13 State Court Summons for State Court Summons for Stanley Access, #14 State Court Return of Service for DH Pace, #15 State Court Return of Service for Petco Animal Supplies, #16 State Court Return of Service for Petco Animal Supplies Store, #17 State Court Return of Service for Stanley Access, #18 State Court DH Pace Answer and Jury Demand, #19 State Court Petco Defendants' Answer and Jury Demand, #20 State Court Stanley Access Answer and Jury Demand, #21 State Court Register of Action, #22 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Court Civil Cover Sheet, #23 Exhibit Attachment to Federal Court Civil Cover Sheet)(Stauch, Barbara) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DH Pace Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Stanley Access Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard A. Waltz